EP3105429 - EXHAUST GAS HOUSING FOR AN EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Friedrichshafen GmbH Maybachplatz 1 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEHLER, Klaus Tannenweg 25 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
RUSCH, Klaus Liebenweiler Strasse 3/1 88147 Achberg / DE | 03 /
DENECKE, Heiko Friedrich-Hölderlin-Strasse 14 88094 Oberteuringen / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Alexander Rappenwaldstrasse 25a 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [2017/02] |
Former [2016/51] | 01 /
WEHLER, Klaus Tannenweg 25 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
02 /
RUSCH, Klaus Liebenweiler Strasse 3/1 88147 Achberg / DE | |||
03 /
DENECKE, Heiko Ginsterweg 12 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | |||
04 /
SCHNEIDER, Alexander Rappenwaldstrasse 25a 6800 Feldkirch / AT | Representative(s) | Kordel, Mattias, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14761956.3 | 11.09.2014 | [2016/51] | WO2014EP02460 | Priority number, date | DE20141002048 | 14.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014002048 | [2016/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015120870 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3105429 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/28 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
F01N3/2839 (EP,US);
F01N13/017 (EP,US);
F01N2450/30 (EP,US);
F01N2470/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | ABGASGEHÄUSE FÜR EIN ABGASSYSTEM EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2016/51] | English: | EXHAUST GAS HOUSING FOR AN EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2016/51] | French: | CARTER DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR SYSTÈME DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0770766 (KABUSHIKI KAISYA O DEN [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figure 2 * * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 5 * [I] 4,11,12; | [XI]DE19745068 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * figure -; claim - * [I] 11,12; | [A]DE202007000879U (GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure .; claim 1 * * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]US2008229733 (NEWBURRY DONALD M [US], et al) [A] 1-12* figures 1-3; claims 1,4 * | Examination | US4238455 | DE3622690 | US4849185 |