EP2973271 - DYNAMIC CURRENCY CONVERSION TRANSACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pure Commerce Pty Limited Level 13 309 Pitt Street Sydney New South Wales 2000 / AU | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Sunil Level 13 309 Pitt Street Sydney New South Wales 2000 / AU | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Graham, Emma Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14762613.9 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB00343 | Priority number, date | AU20130900873 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: AU 2013900873 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140761 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973271 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G06Q20/381 (EP,US);
G06Q20/08 (US);
G06Q20/405 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G06Q20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | TRANSAKTIONSSYSTEM MIT DYNAMISCHER WÄHRUNGSUMRECHNUNG | [2016/03] | English: | DYNAMIC CURRENCY CONVERSION TRANSACTION SYSTEM | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSACTION PAR CONVERSION DE DEVISE DYNAMIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 16.09.2015 | Observations by third parties | 25.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006022032 (FILLINGER CHARLES A [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,5,6 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 2-15; | [A]US2011307384 (DIGRIGOLI GIACOMO [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2013001303 (IM SUNG BIN [US]) [X] 1,4-6,9-13 * abstract * * figures 1,5,6 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0047] * * claims 18-51 * [I] 2,3,7,8,14,15 | International search | [X]US2005154674 (NICHOLLS MICHAEL K [US], et al); | [X]NZ549154 (PURE COMMERCE PTY LTD) | other | GB2230637 | JPH11203588 | WO2009112812 |