EP2969164 - REACTOR VESSEL FOR COMPLEXECELLE FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NANO ONE MATERIALS CORP. Suite 620-650 West Georgia Street Vancouver, BC V6B 4N9 / CA | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIANEZA-KULLBERG, Teresita 2896 Berwick Lane Gastonia, NC 28054 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14762853.1 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB01054 | Priority number, date | US201313839110 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313839110 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014140874 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2969164 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/18, B01F3/04, B01J13/02 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B01J10/002 (EP,US);
B01F23/23121 (EP,US);
B01F23/231265 (EP,US);
B01F23/2331 (EP,US);
B01F23/23311 (EP,US);
B01F23/233641 (EP,US);
B01F25/50 (EP,US);
B01F25/72 (EP,US);
B01F25/741 (EP,US);
B01F27/118 (EP,US);
B01F27/95 (EP,US);
B01F27/96 (EP,US);
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
B01J19/0073 (EP,US);
B01J4/004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | REAKTIONSGEFÄSS FÜR COMPLEXECELLE-BILDUNG | [2016/03] | English: | REACTOR VESSEL FOR COMPLEXECELLE FORMATION | [2016/03] | French: | CUVE DE RÉACTEUR POUR FORMATION DE COMPLEXECELLE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 15.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2013005011 (BELL PETER SIMPSON [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9,13-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * figures 1,3A-5 * [A] 10 [Y] 2,11,12; | [XAY]US6447743 (DEVIC MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,8,9,13,14 * column 5, line 12 - line 55 * * figure . * [A] 7,10 [Y] 2,11,12; | [XAY]WO9418306 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,9,10 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 7 * * page 10, line 23 - line 34 * * page 26, line 34 - page 27, line 4 * * figure 1 * [A] 7,8,11,13-15 [Y] 2,12; | [Y]EP0931493 (RONIC IND [FR]) [Y] 2,11,12 * figure - *; | [Y]FR2594377 (MOGILEVSKY MASHINOSTROITELNY I [SU]) [Y] 2,11 * figure - *; | [Y]US2007014187 (KAAS RANDY [US]) [Y] 2,11 * figure - *; | [Y]FR1243122 (BRITISH PLASTER BOARD HOLDINGS) [Y] 2,11 * figure - *; | [Y]US2864594 (MARTINEK THOMAS W) [Y] 12 * figure - * | International search | [A]US2008118946 (FABIYI MALCOLM EZEKIEL [US], et al); | [A]US2009152744 (MOU DUEN GANG [TW]); | [A]US4207180 (CHANG SHIH-CHIH [US]); | [A]US2007091716 (ZEIKUS J G [US]); | [A]CA2416461 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]) |