EP2972656 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A PUMP AND MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pentair Flow Technologies, LLC 293 Wright Street Delavan, WI 53115 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASCHE, Micheal, Robert N1184 Cty. C Sharon, WI 53585 / US | 02 /
BAASE, Gary, Thomas 6108 43rd Avenue Kenosha, WI 53142 / US | 03 /
GENAW, William James 174C Westfield Way Pewaukee, Wisconsin 53072 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14763036.2 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US30703 | Priority number, date | US201361798161P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361798161 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014145867 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2972656 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04B47/02, F04B49/02, F04B49/10, G01R31/02, G01R31/34, H02H5/10, H02P3/06, H02P27/04, H02P27/06, H02P29/024 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
H02P3/06 (EP,US);
F04B47/02 (EP,US);
F04B49/02 (EP,US);
F04B49/10 (EP,US);
G01R31/343 (US);
G01R31/50 (EP,US);
H02H5/105 (EP,US);
H02P27/04 (EP,US);
H02P29/0241 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G06F1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER PUMPE UND EINES MOTORS | [2016/03] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING A PUMP AND MOTOR | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE POMPE ET DE MOTEUR | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5113303 (HERRES DONALD C [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 17; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]DE29600914U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 12; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19601880 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 38; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5845225 (MOSHER FREDERICK A [US]) [Y] 13 * column 3, lines 24-28 *; | [Y]US6264431 (TRIEZENBERG DAVID M [US]) [Y] 11 * column 7, lines 49-60 * * column 8, lines 28-35 *; | [Y]US6356853 (SULLIVAN DANIEL B [US]) [Y] 5 * column 4, lines 6-27; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002070611 (CLINE DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0090] - [0093] - [0099] *; | [A]US2005123408 (KOEHL ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0026] - [0035] - [0089] - [0091]; figures 1,12 *; | [IY]US2010312398 (KIDD MELISSA DRECHSEL [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6,7,10,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0070] , [0071] , [0077] , [0117] , [0122] , [0124] , [0127]; figures 1-6,34,39-41,44A * [Y] 5,8,9,11,13 | International search | [Y]US5845225 (MOSHER FREDERICK A [US]); | [Y]US6264431 (TRIEZENBERG DAVID M [US]); | [Y]US6356853 (SULLIVAN DANIEL B [US]); | [Y]US2002070611 (CLINE DAVID J [US], et al); | [X]US2010312398 (KIDD MELISSA DRECHSEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US5113303 | US2010312398 |