EP2973856 - ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUKI, Takashi c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14763106.3 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014JP57630 | Priority number, date | JP20130053237 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013053237 | JP20130070150 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013070150 | JP20130070151 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013070151 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014142345 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973856 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q7/06, G06K19/077, H01Q7/08, H01Q21/24 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
H01Q7/08 (EP,US);
G06K19/07777 (EP,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H01Q7/06, G06K17/00, G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | [2016/03] | English: | ANTENNA DEVICE | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 11.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2020 | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JP2004200829 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [X]JP2003318633 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION); | [X]JP2007019891 (TODA KOGYO CORP.); | [X]JP2005318102 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [X]JP2006295981 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION); | [X]JP2007028114 (TODA KOGYO CORP.); | [X]JP2008042761 (TOSHIBA CORPORATION); | [A]WO2010013992 (KOH ENG SIANG) | by applicant | JP2004200829 | JP2010056982 | JP2006050522 |