EP2970877 - NEURAL PROGENITOR CELL DIFFERENTIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wake Forest University Health Sciences Medical Center Boulevard Winston-Salem, NC 27157 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Wake Forest University Health Sciences 391 Technology Way, Suite 199 Winston-Salem, NC 27101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bitar, Khalil 634 Gramercy Street Winston Salem, NC 27104 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/04] | 01 /
Bitar, Khalil Medical Center Boulevard Winston Salem North Carolina 27157 / US | ||
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
Bitar, Khalil 634 Gramercy Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27104 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/03] | Tuxworth, Pamela M. J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14763675.7 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US30456 | Priority number, date | US201361788285P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788285 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014145653 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2970877 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970877 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0793, C12N5/079, C12N5/071, C12N5/077, A61K35/30, A61K35/34 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C12N5/0619 (EP,US);
A61K35/30 (US);
A61K35/34 (US);
C12N5/0622 (EP,US);
C12N2502/1347 (EP,US);
C12N2533/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | C12N5/0793, C12N5/079, C12N5/071, C12N5/077 | ||
Former IPC [2016/03] | C12N5/00, C12N5/071, C12N5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIERUNG NEURONALER VORLÄUFERZELLEN | [2016/03] | English: | NEURAL PROGENITOR CELL DIFFERENTIATION | [2016/03] | French: | DIFFÉRENCIATION DE CELLULES PROGÉNITRICES NEURALES | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 03.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2014 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | IE | 17.03.2019 | LU | 17.03.2019 | MT | 17.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0149827 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,8 * * page 10, lines 13-20 *; | [A]WO03029418 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [A]WO2011059920 (DAVID GLADSTONE INST [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1; claims 1,7 *; | [A] - CARRIE L. GEISBAUER, "Transplantation of Enteric Cells into the Rodent Stomach with Basic Fibroblast Growth Factor", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE & THERAPY, (20110101), vol. 02, no. 01, doi:10.4172/2157-7013.1000103, XP055246820 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/2157-7013.1000103 | [A] - SHREYA RAGHAVAN ET AL, "Bioengineered Three-Dimensional Physiological Model of Colonic Longitudinal Smooth Muscle In Vitro Background", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART C: METHODS, (20100901), vol. 999, no. 1009, pages 16 - 5, XP055281051 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - GIUSEPPE ORLANDO ET AL, "Regenerative medicine as applied to solid organ transplantation: current status and future challenges", TRANSPLANT INTERNATIONAL., GB, (20101110), vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1432-2277.2010.01182.x, ISSN 0934-0874, pages 223 - 232, XP055293163 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-2277.2010.01182.x | [XP] - RAGHAVAN SHREYA ET AL, "Neuroglial differentiation of adult enteric neuronal progenitor cells as a function of extracellular matrix composition", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20130605), vol. 34, no. 28, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2013.05.023, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 6649 - 6658, XP028573398 [XP] 11-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2013.05.023 | [T] - RAGHAVAN SHREYA ET AL, "The influence of extracellular matrix composition on the differentiation of neuronal subtypes in tissue engineered innervated intestinal smooth muscle sheets", BIOMATERIALS, (20140611), vol. 35, no. 26, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2014.05.037, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 7429 - 7440, XP028874886 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2014.05.037 | International search | [Y]US2006153815 (SEYDA AGNIESZKA [US], et al); | [Y]US2011151011 (FLYNN LAUREN E [CA]); | [X] - GEISBAUER, C.L. ET AL., "Transplantation Of Enteric Cells Into The Rodent Stomach With Basic Fibroblast Growth Factor.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE & THERAPY., (20110310), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 1 - 6, XP055246820 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/2157-7013.1000103 | [Y] - RAGHAVAN, S. ET AL., "Bioengineered Three-Dimensional Physiological Model Of Colonic Longitudinal Smooth Muscle In Vitro.", TISSUE ENGINEERING: PART C: METHODS., (201010), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 999 - 1009, XP055281051 | [Y] - WARD, S.M. ET AL., "Interstitial Cells Of Cajal Mediate Cholinergic Neurotransmission From Enteric Motor Neurons.", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE., (20000215), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 1393 - 1403, XP055281061 | [Y] - HANSEN, R.R. ET AL., "Characterization Of Collagen Thin Flims For Von Willebrand Factor Binding And Platelet Adhesion.", LANGMUIR., (20111003), vol. 27, no. 22, pages 13648 - 13658, XP055281066 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la2023727 | [Y] - BAGYANSZKI, M. ET AL., "Diabetes-Related Alterations In The Enteric Nervous System And Its Microenvironment.", WORLD JOURNAL OF DIABETES., (20120515), vol. 3, pages 80 - 93, XP055281070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4239/wjd.v3.i5.80 | [Y] - FUJIMIYA, M. ET AL., "Peptidergic Regulation Of Gastrointestinal Motility In Rodents.", PEPTIDES., (200010), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 1565 - 1582, XP055281076 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-9781(00)00313-2 | [Y] - DAHM, L.M. ET AL., "Substance P Responsiveness Of Smooth Muscle Cells Is Regulated By The Integrin Ligand, Thrombospondin.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (19960206), vol. 93, pages 1276 - 1281, XP002997948 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.3.1276 | [Y] - TULLA, M. ET AL., "Selective Binding Of Collagen Subtypes By Integrin Alpha 1-I, Alpha 2-I, and Alpha 10-I Domains.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010925), vol. 276, no. 51, pages 48206 - 48212, XP002521863 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M104058200 | [XP] - RAGHAVAN, S. ET AL., "The Influence Of Extracellular Matrix Composition On The Differentiation Of Neuronal Subtypes In Tissue Engineered Innervated Intestinal Smooth Muscle Sheets.", BIOMATERIALS, (20140611), vol. 35, no. 26, pages 7429 - 7440, XP028874886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2014.05.037 | by applicant | US5451613 | US5654183 | US5766948 | WO9850526 | US5849553 | US5851832 | WO9901159 | US6040180 | - M. V. WILES, METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 225, page 900 | - P. D. RATHJEN ET AL., REPROD. FERTIL. DEV., (1998), vol. 10, page 31 | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS | - SOMARA ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL GASTROINTEST LIVER PHYSIOL, (2006), vol. 291, no. 4, pages G630 - G639 | - ALMOND ET AL., "Characterisation and transplantation of enteric nervous system progenitor cells", GUT, (2007), vol. 56, no. 4, pages 489 - 496 | WO2013US24080 | WO2013US24024 |