EP2974282 - DISPLAY DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING DIGITAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Videri Inc. 541 W. 23rd Street New York, NY 10011 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRACHTENBERG, Marc 161 West 87th Street New York, NY 10024 / US | 02 /
GARIEPY, Francois 661 Belmont Westmount, QC H3Y 2W3 / CA | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/49] |
Former [2016/03] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14764234.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US29431 | Priority number, date | US201361800681P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361800681 P | US201361917067P | 17.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361917067 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014144849 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974282 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2974282 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/41, H04N5/64, H04N5/63, G06F1/16, G06F21/10, G06F21/60, G09F9/30, H04L9/08, H04L29/06, H04N21/2347, H04N21/25, H04N21/422, H04N21/43, H04N21/4627, H04N21/4788, H04N21/485, H04N21/61, H04N21/835, H04N21/254, H04N21/84 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1628 (US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/1637 (EP,US);
G06F21/1083 (EP,US);
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G09F9/30 (EP,US);
G11B27/00 (US);
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
H04L63/0457 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04L9/0819 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/25875 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/42224 (EP,US);
H04N21/4307 (US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/436 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/6175 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04N21/854 (EP,US);
H04N21/8545 (EP,US);
H04N5/63 (EP,US);
H04N5/64 (EP,US);
H04L2209/603 (EP,US);
H04L67/00 (US);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | H04N5/64, G06F1/16, H04N5/63, H04N21/41 | ||
Former IPC [2016/03] | H04N5/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE DIGITALER BILDGEBUNG | [2016/03] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING DIGITAL IMAGING | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR AFFICHER UNE IMAGERIE NUMERIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20211127.4 / EP3813358 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2017 | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | IT | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IE | 14.03.2021 | LU | 14.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5666422 (HARRISON ROBERT W [US], et al) [I] 14* figure 2 *; | [IA]US2005110911 (CHILDREY JOSEPH B [US], et al) [I] 2,6,7,13,15,16 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * [A] 1,3-5,8-12,14; | [I]US2011242439 (CALDERON RAFAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * | International search | [A]US2007252919 (MCGREEVY ROY L [US]); | [X]US2011069055 (JUNG SUNG SOO [KR], et al); | [A]KR20110067537 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]US2012243188 (HAN RUI [CN], et al); | [A]KR20120113094 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | US5941493 | US2001048584 | US2007097619 |