EP2969784 - METHOD FOR FORMING A THREADED NECK ON A METALLIC BOTTLE AND SUCH BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A THREADED NECK ON A METALLIC BOTTLE | ||
[2023/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ball Corporation 9200 West 108th Circle Westminster, CO 80021 / US | [2024/12] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Ball Corporation 10 Longs Peak Drive Broomfield, CO 80021-2510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Greg 7257 Spring Court Boulder, CO 80303 / US | 02 /
BONFOEY, David, J. 869 E. 132nd Circle Thornton, CO 80241 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Dean, L. 10935 West Polk Drive Littleton, CO 80127 / US | 04 /
SCOTT, Anthony, J. 1926 W. 131st Lane Westminister, CO 80234 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2024/19] |
Former [2016/03] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14764861.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US28303 | Priority number, date | US201361799214P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361799214 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014144055 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2969784 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2969784 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B21D51/26 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B21D51/38 (EP,US);
B65D1/0246 (US);
B21D51/2638 (EP,US);
B65D1/023 (EP,US);
B65D41/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | B65D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 15.10.2015 | ME | 15.10.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEWINDEHALSES AUF EINER METALLISCHEN FLASCHE UND EINE FLASCHE | [2023/19] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A THREADED NECK ON A METALLIC BOTTLE AND SUCH BOTTLE | [2023/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FORMER UN GOULOT FILETÉ SUR UNE BOUTEILLE MÉTALLIQUE ET UNE BOUTEILLE | [2023/19] |
Former [2016/03] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEWINDEHALSES AUF EINER METALLISCHEN FLASCHE | ||
Former [2016/03] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A THREADED NECK ON A METALLIC BOTTLE | ||
Former [2016/03] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FORMER UN GOULOT FILETÉ SUR UNE BOUTEILLE MÉTALLIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 13.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE6903478U (ALCAN ALUMINIUMWERKE GMBH FA [DE]) [X] 1,7,10 * figures 1,3 * [I] 2-6,8,9; | [XI]WO9932363 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US], et al) [X] 1,7,10 * abstract *[I] 2-6,8,9; | [XI]FR2775206 (CEBAL [FR]) [X] 1,7,10 * abstract * [I] 2-6,8,9; | [XI]EP1136154 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,10 * abstract * [I] 2-6,8,9 | International search | [Y]US3144964 (HOWARD GOFF DONALD, et al); | [Y]US3227318 (RIEDER OTTO E); | [Y]US2003132188 (BEEK ALEX VAN DER [LV], et al); | [Y]US2003197018 (CHUPAK THOMAS [US]); | [X]US2007051687 (OLSON CHRISTOPHER J [US]) | by applicant | DE6903478U | US4403493 | US4693108 | US4732027 | US5138858 | US5448903 | US5469729 | US5713235 | US5778723 | US7140223 |