EP2975106 - LUBRICANT OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAI Toshiaki 24-4 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14764912.3 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014JP56640 | Priority number, date | JP20130054118 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013054118 | [2016/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014142231 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975106 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, C10M135/36, C10M137/10, C10M159/22, C10M159/24, C10N10/04, C10N20/00, C10N30/06, C10N30/12, C10N40/04, C10M163/00 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
C10M141/10 (EP,US);
C10M163/00 (EP,US);
C10M169/045 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/028 (EP,US);
C10M2207/046 (EP,US);
C10M2207/144 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/08 (EP,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2229/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,US);
C10N2030/52 (EP,US);
C10N2030/54 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/028, C10N2010/04 (US,EP);
C10M2207/262, C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28, C10N2060/14 (US,EP);
C10M2219/046, C10N2010/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2016/03] | C10M169/04, C10M135/36, C10M137/10, C10M159/22, C10M159/24, C10N10/04, C10N20/00, C10N30/06, C10N30/12, C10N40/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2016/03] | English: | LUBRICANT OIL COMPOSITION | [2016/03] | French: | COMPOSITION D'HUILE DE GRAISSAGE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2015 | Translation filed | 06.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 07.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/12] | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0382242 (COSMO OIL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 2, lines 38-52; page 4, line 1 to page 5, line 16; page 5, lines 28,29;; examples 5,6; claims 1,3-12; tables 1,2 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 1-9; | [X]US2011053816 (NARITA KEIICHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * Comparative Example 6; paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0040] - [0043] - [0052]; claims 1,5-7 *; | [Y]EP0391649 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 29, line 35 to page 32, line 53; page 33, lines 1,2; page 36, lines 39,40;;; claims 25,26,28 *; | [Y]US2004204325 (TAKAHASHI MASATO [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0015] , [0033] - [0105] - [0162] , [0168] *; | JP2003138285 [ ] (NIPPON OIL CORP); | [Y]EP2145941 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0014] - [0019] - [0028]; claims 1,4,6,7,9 *; | WO2008133327 [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) | International search | [X]JP2003138285 (NIPPON OIL CORP); | [X]WO2009101847 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2008133327 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008222904 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) | by applicant | JP4377505B | JP2007126543 | JP2010189479 | JP2011006705 | JP4117043B |