EP2968227 - S-ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED COMPOSITIONS OF BETA BLOCKERS FOR TREATING AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coats, Andrew J.S. 78/151 Fitzroy Street St. Kilda Victoria 3182 / AU | For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COATS, Andrew J.S. 78/151 Fitzroy Street St. Kilda, Victoria 3182 / AU | 02 /
ANKER, Stefan Oberseestrasse 91 13053 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SPRINGER, Jochen Mainstr. 1B 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14764992.5 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014AU00274 | Priority number, date | US201361786235P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361786235 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014138814 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968227 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968227 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/138, A61K31/165, A61K31/404, A61P25/28 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | S-ENANTIOMERENANGEREICHERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON BETABLOCKERN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AMYOTROPHER LATERALSKLEROSE | [2016/03] | English: | S-ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED COMPOSITIONS OF BETA BLOCKERS FOR TREATING AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS | [2016/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE BÊTAS BLOQUANTS ENRICHIES DU POINT DE VUE DES ÉNANTIOMÈRES-S POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLÉROSE LATÉRALE AMYOTROPHIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 03.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | MT | 14.03.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101323580 ; | [X]EP0930291 (DAISO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 10,11 * column 1, paragraph 1; example 2 *; | [X]US2005143378 (YUN ANTHONY J [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 12, paragraph 88 * * page 20, paragraph 190; claims 1,21,29 *; | [X]WO2007014219 (CURAVITA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 27 * * page 13, line 12 - line 22 * * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 16 * * example -; claims 1,4,5,9-11,3 *; | [X] - HAMPTON T G ET AL, "Propranolol attenuates sympathetic hyperfunction, delays motor dysfunction, and prolongs life in a mouse model of amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, & 28TH CONGRESS OF THE EUROPEAN-SOCIETY-OF-CARDIOLOGY/WORLD CONGRESS OF CARDIOLOGY; BARCELONA, SPAIN; SEPTEMBER 02 -06, 2006, (200608), vol. 27, no. Suppl. 1, page 962, XP002761890 [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 13, Database accession no. 2009-B43243, XP002761891 & CN101323580 A 20081217 (UNIV HEBEI SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 10,11 * abstract * | [A] - YASHIMA E ET AL, "Continuous and Preparative Enantioseparation of Oxprenolol with Cellulose Tris(3,5-dimethylphenylcarbamate)-coated Belt", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, (19950801), vol. 6, no. 8, doi:10.1016/0957-4166(95)00244-J, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1889 - 1890, XP004048078 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00244-J | International search | [X]US2012095070 (SPRINGER JOCHEN [DE], et al); | [XP]WO2014016585 (PSIOXUS THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]); | [X] - MARTÍNEZ-GÓMEZ M.A. ET AL., "Chiral separation of oxprenolol by affinity electrokinetic chromatography-partial filling technique using human serum albumin as chiral selector.", J PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (20050901), vol. 39, no. 1-2, pages 76 - 81, XP027718928 | by applicant | US2005143378 | WO2007014219 | - WORMS PM., "The epidemiology of motor neuron disease: a review of recent studies", J Neurol Sci, (20010000), vol. 191, pages 3 - 9 | - WIJESEKERA LC; LEIGH PN, "Amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", Orphanet Journal of Rare Disease, (20090000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1186/1750-1172-4-3, page 3, XP021052313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1750-1172-4-3 | - RUTKOVE et al., Amyotroph Lateral Scler., (20120900), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 439 - 4 | - "The Industrial Synthesis of Optically Active Compounds", R. A. SHELDON, Problems and Wonders if Chiral Molecules, Akademiai Kiado, (19900000), pages 349 - 386 | - AUGUSTIAN J et al., Process Biochemistry, (20101000), vol. 45, no. 10, pages 1587 - 1604 | - YASHIMA E. et al., Tetrahedron: Asymmetry, (19950800), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1889 - 1890 | - Eur J Drug Metab Pharmacokinet, vol. 23, no. 2, pages 178 - 84 | - BENNETT PN; BENNETT J; BRADBROOK I; FRANCIS J; JOHN VA; ROGERS H; TURNER P; WARRINGTON SJ. BR, J Clin Pharmacol., (19850000), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 171 S - 175S | - WOODS KL; JACK DB; KENDALL MJ; HALSEY A; O'DONNELL ML; WARRINGTON SJ; JOHN VA. BR, J Clin Pharmacol, (19850000), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 177S - 184S |