EP3039559 - CONFIGURABLE CLOCK TREE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUI, Yaxin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14766255.5 | 19.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US51756 | Priority number, date | US201361872547P | 30.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361872547 P | US201414462327 | 18.08.2014 Original published format: US201414462327 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015031114 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039559 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3039559 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F1/10 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G06F13/4273 (EP,KR,US);
H04L7/0037 (KR,US);
G06F1/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARER TAKTBAUM | [2016/27] | English: | CONFIGURABLE CLOCK TREE | [2016/27] | French: | ARBRE D'HORLOGE CONFIGURABLE | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17185825.1 / EP3273359 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2014 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9110951 (CRAY RESEARCH INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 9, line 11 - page 19, line 3 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO9420898 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 17, line 11 - page 23, line 16 * * figures 5, 6 *; | [A]US2010090738 (CHANGCHEIN WEI-PIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 4-7 ** paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0047] * |