EP3053226 - OPTO-OPTICAL MODULATION OF A SATURABLE ABSORBER FOR HIGH BANDWIDTH CEO STABILIZATION OF A FEMTOSECOND LASER FREQUENCY COMB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/32] | LASER SOURCE | ||
[2016/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Neuchâtel Faubourg de l'Hôpital 41 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2017/15] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Université de Neuchâtel Faubourg du Lac 5a 2000 Neuchatel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHILT, Stéphane Rue de la Riaz 10 CH-1026 Echandens / CH | 02 /
HOFFMAN, Martin Blumenfeldstraße 3 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | 03 /
SÜDMEYER, Thomas Vogelsangstrasse 16 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 14766497.3 | 17.09.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014EP69773 | Priority number, date | CH20130001686 | 01.10.2013 Original published format: CH 16862013 | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015049106 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3053226 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3053226 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/11, H01S3/13 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
H01S3/1118 (EP,US);
G02F1/0126 (EP,US);
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
H01S3/0085 (US);
H01S3/0092 (US);
H01S3/0941 (US);
H01S3/1307 (EP,US);
H01S3/1312 (EP,US);
H01S3/1608 (EP,US);
H01S3/1618 (EP,US);
H01S3/17 (EP,US);
G02F1/3528 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTO-OPTISCHE MODULATION EINES SÄTTIGBAREN ABSORBERS ZUR CEO-STABILISIERUNG IN GROSSER BANDBREITE EINES FEMTOSEKUNDENLASERKAMMS | [2016/44] | English: | OPTO-OPTICAL MODULATION OF A SATURABLE ABSORBER FOR HIGH BANDWIDTH CEO STABILIZATION OF A FEMTOSECOND LASER FREQUENCY COMB | [2016/44] | French: | MODULATION OPTO-OPTIQUE D'UN ABSORBEUR SATURABLE POUR LA STABILISATION LARGE BANDE DU DÉCALAGE D'ENVELOPPE PORTEUSE D'UN PEIGNE DE FRÉQUENCES D'UN LASER FEMTOSECONDE | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/32] | LASERQUELLE | ||
Former [2016/32] | LASER SOURCE | ||
Former [2016/32] | SOURCE LASER | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2014 | AL | 24.05.2017 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IE | 17.09.2017 | LU | 17.09.2017 | MT | 17.09.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/41] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
MT | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.09.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10135453 (UNIV KARLSRUHE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A] - C-C LEE ET AL, "Frequency comb stabilization with bandwidth beyond the limit of gain lifetime by an intracavity graphene electro-optic modulator", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 37, no. 15, doi:10.1364/OL.37.003084, ISSN 0146-9592, (201208), pages 3084 - 3086, (20120719), XP001577478 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3085 * * figure 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.37.003084 | [A] - MEYER S A ET AL, "Diode-pumped Yb:KYW femtosecond laser frequency comb with stabilized carrier-envelope offset frequency", THE EUROPEAN PHYSICAL JOURNAL D ; ATOMIC, MOLECULAR AND OPTICAL PHYSICS, SOCIETÀ ITALIANA DI FISICA, BO, (20080123), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 1434-6079, pages 19 - 26, XP019594199 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * the whole document * * part 2.3 * * figure 1 * | [A] - STUMPF M C ET AL, "First fully stabilized frequency comb from a SESAM-modelocked 1.5-Â[mu]m solid-state oscillator", CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS (CLEO) AND QUANTUM ELECTRONICS AND LASER SCIENCE CONFERENCE (QELS), 2010 : 16 - 21 MAY 2010, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ , USA, (20100516), ISBN 978-1-55752-890-2, pages 1 - 2, XP031701991 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 2 * * the whole document * | [AD] - STEPHANE SCHILT ET AL, "Fully stabilized optical frequency comb with sub-radian CEO phase noise from a SESAM-modelocked 15- m solid-state laser", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20111121), vol. 19, no. 24, doi:10.1364/OE.19.024171, ISSN 1094-4087, page 24171, XP055165960 [AD] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.19.024171 | [XP] - MARTIN HOFFMANN ET AL, "Low-noise CEO stabilization of a femtosecond DPSSL using an optically-pumped SESAM as fast opto-optical modulator", ADVANCED SOLID-STATE LASERS CONGRESS, Washington, D.C., (20131027), doi:10.1364/ASSL.2013.JTh5A.4, ISBN 978-1-55-752982-4, page 3, XP055166041 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/ASSL.2013.JTh5A.4 | [XP] - MARTIN HOFFMANN ET AL, "CEO stabilization of a femtosecond laser using a SESAM as fast opto-optical modulator", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20131202), vol. 21, no. 24, doi:10.1364/OE.21.030054, ISSN 1094-4087, page 30054, XP055165987 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.21.030054 | [XP] - TIM HELLWIG ET AL, "Toward an all-optically stabilized frequency comb based on a mode-locked fiber laser", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (20140123), vol. 39, no. 3, doi:10.1364/OL.39.000525, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 525 - 527, XP001587123 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.39.000525 | [XP] - HOFFMANN, "Opto-Optical Modulation of an Intra-Cavity SESAM for Low-Noise CEO Stabilization of a Femtosecond Laser", CLEO: SCIENCE AND INNOVATIONS CONFERENCE PAPER, (201406), XP002735524 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/CLEO_SI.2014.SW1O.6 |