EP3028538 - STOVE TOP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDE ARANDA, Ignacio Maurice Ravel 31-5ºB E-50012 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
GRACIA CAMPOS, Oscar Pº Rosales Nº16 5º Dcha E-50008 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
MURESAN, Paul Nuestra Señora del Pilar Nr. 22 E-50720 La Cartuja / ES | 04 /
PALACIOS TOMAS, Daniel Ceasáreo Alierta nº 31 Esc. dcha 6ºA E-50008 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
VILLANUEVA VALERO, Beatriz Avda. San Jorge 96 E-44500 Andorra Teruel / ES | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14767121.8 | 24.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014IB63373 | Priority number, date | ES20130031223 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: ES 201331223 | [2016/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015015373 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3028538 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3028538 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H05B6/1272 (EP);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | H05B6/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHFELDVORRICHTUNG | [2016/23] | English: | STOVE TOP DEVICE | [2016/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TABLE DE CUISSON | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 22.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011067708 (INDESIT CO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-12 * * page 9, lines 12-16 * * page 11, lines 5-13 ** figures 5,10 *; | [XI]EP2506675 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0041] - [0048] - [0065] - [0071] - [0098] - [0101] * * figures 1-4,5A,6,8 * [I] 3,8; | [X]EP2506668 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] , [0076] , [0077] * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [X]EP2509392 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0038] - [0040] - [0055] * * figures 1-3 * |