EP3044258 - PEROXIDE-CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALREJA, Manish 400 Arcola Rd RC-3178 Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 02 /
COGEN, Jeffrey, M. 6 Braintree Ct. Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 03 /
GROOT-ENZERNIK, Gerrit Schnetzerenbach 13 CH-8841 Gross / CH | 04 /
PERSON, Timothy, J. 1521 Finley Cir. Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | 05 /
DUNCHUS, Neil, W. 6 Dogwood Trail Kinnelon, NJ 07405 / US | 06 /
BUCKLER, Gary, W. 110 Bloomingdale Cir. Victoria, TX 77904 / US | 07 /
GOETHEL, Gabriele Roentgenstr. 7 06217 Merseburg / DE | 08 /
SENGUPTA, Saurav, S. 1776 Building C21 Michigan Operations The Dow Chemical Company Midland, MI 48640 / US | 09 /
ADAMCAZYK, Antoni 187 Dunellen Ave. Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | [2017/36] |
Former [2016/32] | 01 /
TALREJA, Manish 400 Arcola Rd RC-3178 Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | ||
02 /
COGEN, Jeffrey, M. 6 Braintree Ct. Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | |||
03 /
GROOT-ENZERNIK, Gerrit Schnetzerenbach 13 CH-8841 Gross / CH | |||
04 /
PERSON, Timothy, J. 1521 Finley Cir. Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | |||
05 /
DUNCHUS, Neil, W. 6 Dogwood Trl. Kinnelon, NJ 07405 / US | |||
06 /
BUCKLER, Gary, W. 110 Bloomingdale Cir. Victoria, TX 77904 / US | |||
07 /
GOETHEL, Gabriele Roentgenstr. 7 06217 Merseburg / DE | |||
08 /
SENGUPTA, Saurav, S. 1776 Building C21 Michigan Operations The Dow Chemical Company Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
09 /
ADAMCAZYK, Antoni 187 Dunellen Ave. Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | |||
Former [2016/29] | 01 /
TALREJA, Manish 1141 Snyder Rd. k 9 Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | ||
02 /
COGEN, Jeffrey, M. 6 Braintree Ct. Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | |||
03 /
GROOT-ENZERNIK, Gerrit Schnetzerenbach 13 CH-8841 Gross / CH | |||
04 /
PERSON, Timothy, J. 1521 Finley Cir. Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | |||
05 /
DUNCHUS, Neil, W. 6 Dogwood Trl. Kinnelon, NJ 07405 / US | |||
06 /
BUCKLER, Gary, W. 110 Bloomingdale Cir. Victoria, TX 77904 / US | |||
07 /
GOETHEL, Gabriele Roentgenstr. 7 06217 Merseburg / DE | |||
08 /
SENGUPTA, Saurav, S. 119 Lincoln Rd. Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
09 /
ADAMCAZYK, Antoni 187 Dunellen Ave. Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14767259.6 | 08.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US54526 | Priority number, date | US201361877405P | 13.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361877405 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015038467 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044258 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044258 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/3492, H01B3/30, H01B13/14 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
C08K5/372 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/3435 (US);
C08K5/34924 (EP,CN,US);
H01B13/148 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEROXIDVERNETZBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/29] | English: | PEROXIDE-CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE | [2016/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS RÉTICULABLES PAR PEROXYDE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17183592.9 / EP3257892 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2014 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | IE | 08.09.2017 | LU | 08.09.2017 | MT | 08.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
MT | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
MT | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
MT | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
MT | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
MT | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
MT | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 08.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0870803 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [XY]EP1243614 (ATOFINA CHEM INC [US]); | [Y]US2002169238 (CARONIA PAUL JOSEPH [US], et al); | [X]US2013210945 (PICOT FABRICE [FR], et al) | by applicant | US3334081 | US4101445 | US4144202 | US4302565 | US4508842 | US4937299 | US5246783 | US5272236 | US5278272 | US5317036 | US5332793 | US5342907 | US5371145 | US5405901 | US5410003 | WO9921194 | US6187858 | US6187847 | US6496629 | US6656986 | US6714707 |