EP3044244 - PIPA POLYOL BASED CONVENTIONAL FLEXIBLE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOKSON, Paul A. c/o The Dow Chemical Company Intellectual Property Law 2040 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 02 /
AMICI-KROUTILOVA, Irena c/o The Dow Chemical Company Intellectual Property Law 2040 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 03 /
LORA LAMIA, Alberto Hangenmoosstrasse 1 CH-8820 Waedenswil / CH | 04 /
CASATI, François Etzelstrasse 25 CH-8808 Pfaffikon / CH | [2020/05] |
Former [2016/29] | 01 /
COOKSON, Paul A. c/o The Dow Chemical Company Intellectual Property Law 2040 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
02 /
AMICI-KROUTILOVA, Irena c/o The Dow Chemical Company Intellectual Property Law 2040 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | |||
03 /
LORA LAMIA, Alberto Hangenmoosstrasse 1 CH-8820 Waedenswil / CH | |||
04 /
CASATI, Francois Etzelstrasse 25 CH-8808 Pfaffikon / CH | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2020/24] |
Former [2016/29] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14767277.8 | 11.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US55264 | Priority number, date | US201361877287P | 13.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361877287 P | US201361877290P | 13.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361877290 P | US201361919983P | 23.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361919983 P | US201461954137P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954137 P | US201461954259P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954259 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015038827 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044244 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044244 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/76, C08G18/08, C08G18/22, C08G18/32, C08G18/40, C08G18/24 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
C08G18/0876 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (US);
C08G18/14 (US);
C08G18/165 (EP,US);
C08G18/1808 (EP,US);
C08G18/222 (EP,US);
C08G18/244 (EP,US);
C08G18/3281 (EP,US);
C08G18/409 (EP,US);
C08G18/4829 (US);
C08G18/6262 (US);
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
C08J9/0004 (US);
C08J9/145 (EP,US);
C08K5/0066 (EP,US);
C08G18/7806 (US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0066, C08L75/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPA-POLYOL-BASIERTER KONVENTIONELLER WEICHSCHAUMSTOFF | [2016/29] | English: | PIPA POLYOL BASED CONVENTIONAL FLEXIBLE FOAM | [2016/29] | French: | MOUSSE SOUPLE CLASSIQUE À BASE DE PIPA-POLYOL | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IE | 11.09.2020 | LU | 11.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IE | 11.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IE | 11.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4093569 (REISCHL ARTUR, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 40-45; example 8 *; | [X]GB2072204 (ROWLANDS J P) [X] 1-15 * examples 9,10; claim 20 *; | [X]US4293470 (CUSCURIDA MICHAEL) [X] 15 * example I *; | [X]US4296213 (CUSCURIDA MICHAEL, et al) [X] 15 * example I *; | [X]US4305857 (REISCHL ARTUR) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 43-48; example 8 *; | [X]US4310449 (REISCHL ARTUR) [X] 1-15 * column 2, lines 30-33; example 8 *; | [X]US4310448 (REISCHL ARTUR) [X] 1-15 * column 2, lines 21-23; example 10 *; | [XD]US4374209 (ROWLANDS JEFFREY P [CH]) [XD] 1-15 * examples 9,10; claim 16 *; | [X]EP0072096 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 15 * example 17 *; | [X]EP0079115 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 15 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0129977 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 15 * example 1 *; | [X]US4518778 (CUSCURIDA MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 2,4B *; | [X]US4523025 (CUSCURIDA MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 15 * example 3 *; | [XD]EP0776922 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [XD] 1-14 * page 8, lines 38,39; examples 22-25 *; | [X]DE19811471 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 15 * example 3 *; | [X]WO0073364 (HUNTSMAN ICI CHEM LLC [US], et al) [X] 15 * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 24 *; | [X]WO03016373 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 15 * example 1 *; | [XD]US2006058410 (YU JIANMING [BE], et al) [XD] 15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] *; | [X]US2007238796 (LOVENICH CATHERINE J [DE], et al) [X] 15 * example 1 *; | [X]WO2008116605 (NAUER FRITZ AG [CH], et al) [X] 15 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2010151431 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 15 * examples E2-E5,E7,E9 *; | [X]WO2012154831 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 15 * example 1 *; | [X]WO2012154820 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 15 * examples 4-6 *; | [XP]WO2013148252 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [XP] 15* table 1 *; | [XDP]WO2014037558 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [XDP] 1-14 * examples 2,4 * |