EP2970461 - INTERFERON ALPHA AND OMEGA ANTIBODY ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHI, Ellen 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121-1126 / US | 02 /
CONNOR, Judith 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121-1126 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Chichi 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 04 /
JORDAN, Jarrat 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 05 /
LIN-SCHMIDT, Xiefan 1400 McKean Road Spring House, PA 19477 / US | 06 /
LUO, Jinquan 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 07 /
LU, Lu 1400 McKean Road Spring House, PA 19477 / US | 08 /
MARTINEZ, Christian 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121-1126 / US | 09 /
OBMOLOVA, Galina 1400 McKean Road Spring House, California 19477 / US | 10 /
SWANSON, Ronald 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121-1126 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Wise, Daniel Joseph Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14768743.8 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25701 | Priority number, date | US201361788302P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788302 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014151422 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970461 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/249 (EP,MX,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,MX,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 09.10.2015 | ME | 09.10.2015 | Title | German: | INTERFERON-ALPHA- UND OMEGA-ANTIKÖRPER-ANTAGONISTEN | [2016/03] | English: | INTERFERON ALPHA AND OMEGA ANTIBODY ANTAGONISTS | [2016/03] | French: | ANTAGONISTES D'ANTICORPS ANTI-INTERFÉRON ALPHA ET OMÉGA | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 17.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2020 | 22.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP0490233 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [I] 1-15 * page 22 - page 24; example 10 * * claim 1 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO02066649 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 5, line 9 - line 13 *; | [Y]WO2009135861 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 34, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [A] - Gonther R Adolf, "Antigenic Structure of Human Interferon ol (Interferon ~tnl): Comparison with Other Human Interferons", J. gen. Virol, (19870101), pages 1669 - 1676, URL: http://jgv.microbiologyresearch.org/deliver/fulltext/jgv/68/6/JV0680061669.pdf?itemId=/content/journal/jgv/10.1099/0022-1317-68-6-1669&mimeType=pdf&isFastTrackArticle=, (20161010), XP055308976 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1672; figure 1 * * page 1672, paragraph 4 * * page 1673; table 1 * | [A] - ADOLF ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies and enzyme immunoassays specific for human interferon (IFN) gw1: Evidence that IFN-omega1 is a component of human leukocyte IFN", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 175, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0042-6822(90)90425-Q, ISSN 0042-6822, (19900401), pages 410 - 417, (19900401), XP023056025 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(90)90425-Q | [A] - M C DALL'ERA ET AL, "Type I interferon correlates with serological and clinical manifestations of SLE", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, (20051201), vol. 64, no. 12, doi:10.1136/ard.2004.033753, ISSN 0003-4967, pages 1692 - 1697, XP055072172 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.2004.033753 | International search | [A]US5317089 (ADOLF GUENTHER [AT]); | [A]US2005019306 (HORVATH CURT M [US], et al); | [Y]US2007014724 (WITTE ALISON [US], et al); | [A]US2009186027 (SOLOMON BEKA [IL], et al); | [A]US2010021477 (TSUI PING [US], et al); | [A]US2012114667 (EBERLEIN CATHERINE ANNE [GB], et al); | [Y] - BENOIT ET AL., "A monoclonal antibody to recombinant human IFN-alpha receptor inhibits biologic activity of several species of human IFN-alpha, IFN-beta, and IFN-omega Detection of heterogeneity of the cellular type I IFN receptor.", J IMMUNOL., (19930201), vol. 150, no. 3, pages 707 - 716, XP055285192 | [Y] - LAFLEUR ET AL., "Interferon-kappa, a novel type I interferon expressed in human keratinocytes.", J BIOL CHEM., (20011026), vol. 276, no. 43, pages 39765 - 39771, XP055285193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M102502200 | [Y] - TERENZI ET AL., "Distinct induction patterns and functions of two closely related interferon- inducible human genes, ISG54 and ISG56.", J BIOL CHEM., (20061110), vol. 281, no. 45, pages 34064 - 34071, XP055285195 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M605771200 |