EP2972310 - DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SAMPLE PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | 02.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labrador Diagnostics LLC 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2020/31] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Theranos IP Company, LLC 7333 Gateway Boulevard Newark, CA 94560 / US | ||
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Theranos, Inc. 7333 Gateway Blvd Newark, CA 94560 / US | ||
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Theranos, Inc. 1701 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOO, Alexander 1601 S. California Ave Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Elizabeth, A. 1601 S. California Ave Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Hampshire, Annabel, et al Avidity IP Limited Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J.J. Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14768967.3 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US22847 | Priority number, date | US201361799533P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361799533 P | US201361806809P | 29.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806809 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014150290 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2972310 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10, G01N35/00, G01N1/28, G01N33/48, G01N29/02 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/5082 (EP);
B01F31/86 (EP,MX,US);
G01N35/00 (MX,US);
C12Q1/04 (MX,US);
G01N1/28 (MX,US);
G01N1/286 (EP,MX,US);
G01N1/38 (EP,MX,US);
G01N33/487 (EP,MX,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2300/0858 (EP);
G01N2001/4094 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00524 (EP,MX,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G01N33/48, G01N29/02, G01N1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROBENVORBEREITUNG | [2016/03] | English: | DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SAMPLE PREPARATION | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/31] | 25.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2021 | 29.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP21181603.8 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6318158 (BREEN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2007016605 (COVARIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 9-22 * * page 9, lines 6-14 * * page 17, line 22 - page 18, line 15; figure 3 * * page 24, line 13 - page 26, line 6; figure 6 * * page 28, line 19 - page 29, line 19 * * page 31, lines 1-23 * * page 36, lines 14-22 *; | [XA]US2010050749 (YUAN BOB [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0075] - [0076]; figure 8 * * paragraphs [0137] - [0139]; figure 16 * [A] 3,10; | [XI]WO2011106384 (GENTURADX INC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-15 * paragraph [1003] * * paragraphs [1091] - [1093] * * paragraph [1248] * * paragraphs [1256] - [1259]; figure 34 * * paragraphs [1283] - [1285] * * paragraphs [1388] - [1403] * [I] 4,11 | International search | [X]EP0337690 (GENE TRAK SYSTEMS [US]); | [Y]WO2011156432 (FIREFLY BIOWORKS INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2011318728 (PHAN HUAN LAC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4683202 | US4816567 | US6410278 | US2006027686 | WO2007016605 | US7429652 | US2010005049 | WO2011106384 | US2011318728 | US8088593 | EP2466291 | US8380541 | WO2013052318 | - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | WO2012US57155 |