EP2971253 - ELECTROCHEMICAL WATER SOFTENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydronovation, Inc. 530 Howard Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JHA, Anil 2877 Turk Blvd. San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | 02 /
RUSH, Benjamin 5915 La Salle Avenue Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 03 /
MEHMI, Ramandeep 647 Colusa Way Livermore, CA 94551 / US | 04 /
NAYLOR, Peter P.O. Box 190245 San Francisco, CA 94119 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Pearce, David Henry Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14769018.4 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US24220 | Priority number, date | US201361798756P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361798756 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014150783 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971253 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/46 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C02F1/4602 (EP,US);
C02F1/469 (US);
C02F1/4691 (US);
C02F1/4693 (EP,US);
C02F1/4695 (US);
C25B1/46 (US);
C02F2103/06 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46 (US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
C02F2209/001 (EP,US);
C02F2209/05 (EP,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,US);
C02F2303/22 (US);
Y02A20/124 (EP,US);
Y02W10/33 (EP,US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN WASSERENTHÄRTUNG | [2016/03] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL WATER SOFTENING SYSTEM | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADOUCISSEMENT D'EAU ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 22.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011120886 (JHA ANIL D [US], et al); | [A]US2005103724 (WILKINS FREDERICK [US], et al) |