EP2967639 - ROTATIONAL ATHERECTOMY DEVICE WITH BIASING CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. 1225 Old Highway 8 NW New Brighton, Minnesota 55112 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGGINS, Joseph 3547 Orchard Lane Minnetonka, MN 55112 / US | 02 /
MCBROOM, Jeffrey Allen 11532 Oregon Avenue N. Champlin, MN 55316 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
HIGGINS, Joseph 3547 Orchard Lane Minnetonka, MN 55112 / US | ||
02 /
MCBROOM, Jeffrey, Allen 11532 Oregon Avenue N. Champlin, MN 55316 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14769035.8 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US27199 | Priority number, date | US201361787027P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361787027 P | US201414208478 | 13.03.2014 Original published format: US201414208478 | US201414208713 | 13.03.2014 Original published format: US201414208713 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152314 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2967639 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/3207, // A61B90/00, F16D7/02, A61B17/32 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/320758 (EP,US);
F16D3/10 (US);
F16D3/12 (US);
A61B2017/320004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320766 (EP,US);
A61B2090/031 (EP,US);
F16D7/025 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61B17/3207 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ROTIERENDE ATHEREKTOMIEVORRICHTUNG MIT VORSPANNUNGSKUPPLUNG | [2016/03] | English: | ROTATIONAL ATHERECTOMY DEVICE WITH BIASING CLUTCH | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATHÉRECTOMIE ROTATIF COMPRENANT UN EMBRAYAGE DE SOLLICITATION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 31.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6517528 (PANTAGES ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11 * column 4, line 65 - column 18, line 49; figures 1-19 * [A] 7,9,10,15 [I] 12-14; | [XA]US2007272269 (WYATT PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0130]; figures 1-27,43-45. 51 * [A] 7,9,10,15; | [A]US2011004107 (ROSENTHAL MICHAEL H [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5377682 (UENO SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 11-14 * column 7, line 58 - column 55, line 46; figures 1-82 *; | [A]US2008306339 (HASHIMOTO TATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0233] - paragraph [0288]; figures 64-79 *; | [A]US2011077673 (GRUBAC VLADIMIR [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [X]US6517528 (PANTAGES ET AL); | [Y]US2011004107 (ROSENTHAL ET AL); | [Y]US5377682 (UENO ET AL) | by applicant | US5360432 | US5314438 | US6517528 | US2007272269 | US2011004107 | US5377682 | US2008306339 | US2011077673 | US5314407 | US2008306498 | US20100713558 |