EP2969978 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAXIMIZING NITROGEN REMOVAL FROM WASTEWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D.C. Water & Sewer Authority 5000 Overlook Avenue SW Washington, DC 20032 / US | For all designated states Hampton Roads Sanitation District 1434 Air Rail Avenue P.O. Box 5911 Virginia Beach, VA 23471-0911 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGMI, Pusker HRSD P.O. Box 5911 Virginia Beach, Virginia 23471-0911 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Mark HRSD P.O. Box 5911 Virginia Beach, Virginia 23471-0911 / US | 03 /
MURTHY, Sudhir N. DC Water and Sewer Authority 5000 Overlook Avenue SW Washington, District of Columbia 20032 / US | 04 /
BOTT, Charles B. HRSD P.O. Box 5911 Virginia Beach, Virginia 23471-0911 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14769473.1 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US28069 | Priority number, date | US201361783232P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361783232 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152872 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969978 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/00, C02F3/30, C02F3/28 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
C02F3/307 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/302 (IL,RU);
C02F3/006 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F1/24 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/104 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/1257 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/1263 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/1268 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F3/301 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F2003/001 (IL,US);
C02F2101/16 (IL,US);
C02F2209/001 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F2209/005 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2209/10 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2209/14 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2209/15 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | C02F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MAXIMIERUNG DER STICKSTOFFENTFERNUNG AUS ABWASSER | [2016/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAXIMIZING NITROGEN REMOVAL FROM WASTEWATER | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MAXIMISER L'ÉLIMINATION DE L'AZOTE DES EAUX USÉES | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 19.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/43] | 21.06.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/43] | Appeal following examination | 21.04.2021 | Appeal received No. T1148/21 | 21.04.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 24.06.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.06.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 21.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006129132 (LYBERATOS GERASIMOS [GR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 5 line 12-26 * * page 9 line 18 to page 10 line 6 * * page 13 line 16 - page 14 line 20 *; | [X]US2010303695 (GONZALEZ OSPINA ADRIANA [FR]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0114] * * par: 83, 84, 88 * * paragraph [0040] *; | [X]CA2780017 (VEOLIA WATER SOLUTIONS & TECH [FR]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 16 last paragraph * * page 28 last paragraph * * page 8, line 6 - line 10 * * page 9, line 1 - line 4 * * page 10, line 1 - line 14 *; | [A]WO2012085288 (VEOLIA WATER SOLUTIONS & TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | US8956540 [ ] (LEMAIRE ROMAIN [FR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - line 48 * * column 5 lines 24-67 * * column 8 lines 4-13 * * column 9 line 55 to column 10 line 43 * * detailed example B and trial C, column 12 line 32 to column 14 line 22 *; | [T] - REGMI PUSKER ET AL, "Control of aeration, aerobic SRT and COD input for mainstream nitritation/denitritation", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140326), vol. 57, doi:10.1016/J.WATRES.2014.03.035, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 162 - 171, XP029021873 [T] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2014.03.035 | [T] - PUSKER REGMI ET AL, "Supplementary Information: Control of aeration, aerobic SRT and COD input for mainstream nitritation/denitritation", WATER RESEARCH., NL, (20140601), vol. 57, doi:10.1016/j.watres.2014.03.035, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 162 - 171, XP055286042 [T] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2014.03.035 | International search | [A]US5525231 (HO KIN M [HK], et al); | [A]US5626755 (KEYSER GENE E [US], et al); | [A]US7153429 (PEDROS PHILIP B [US]); | [A]US8252182 (CHANG NI-BIN [US], et al); | [A]US8323498 (JENKINS THEODORE K [US], et al) |