EP2969272 - APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A LOCAL CLEAN MICRO-ENVIRONMENT NEAR OPTICAL SURFACES OF AN EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CLEANING OPTICAL SURFACES OF AN EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET OPTICAL SYSTEM | ||
[2023/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLA - Tencor Corporation One Technology Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELGADO, Gildardo 5945 Linwood Common Livermore, California 94550 / US | 02 /
CHILESE, Francis C. 500 Estancia Court San Ramon, California 94583 / US | 03 /
GARCIA, Rudy 407 Appian Way Union City, California 94587 / US | 04 /
TAHMASSEBPUR, Mohammed 38 Victory Cpirt San Ramon, California 94582 / US | 05 /
HARB, Salam 1381 Elwood Drive Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/25] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2016/03] | Keane, Paul Fachtna FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14769672.8 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US26910 | Priority number, date | US201361792581P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792581 P | US201313857615 | 05.04.2013 Original published format: US201313857615 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152067 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969272 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2969272 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G03F1/84, B08B5/02, G02B3/00 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B08B5/02 (EP,US);
G02B27/0006 (EP);
G03F1/84 (EP,US);
G03F7/70616 (EP,US);
G03F7/70925 (EP,US);
G03F7/70933 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | B08B5/02, G02B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER LOKALEN SAUBEREN MIKROUMGEBUNG IN DER NÄHE VON OPTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHEN EINES OPTISCHEN EXTREM-UV-SYSTEMS | [2023/03] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A LOCAL CLEAN MICRO-ENVIRONMENT NEAR OPTICAL SURFACES OF AN EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2023/03] | French: | APPAREIL POUR FOURNIR UN MICRO-ENVIRONNEMENT PROPRE LOCAL À PROXIMITÉ DE SURFACES OPTIQUES D'UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE À ULTRAVIOLET EXTRÊME | [2023/03] |
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG DER OPTISCHEN FLÄCHEN EINES OPTISCHEN EXTREM-UV-SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CLEANING OPTICAL SURFACES OF AN EXTREME ULTRAVIOLET OPTICAL SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/03] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR NETTOYER DES SURFACES OPTIQUES D'UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE DANS L'ULTRAVIOLET LOINTAIN | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 04.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2020 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6192897 (KLEBANOFF LEONARD E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,10,12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 14-18 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 64 *; | [XI]EP1726993 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,5,6a,6b * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0046] - [0050] - [0057] - [0061] * [I] 8,13; | [XI]US2011279799 (SINGER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12 * abstract * * figures 3a-3c * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0013] , [0014] , [0070] - [0077] * [I] 9,13-15; | [E]WO2014126915 (KLA TENCOR CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1A, 1B * * page 1, lines 14-34 * * page 2, lines 2-22 ** page 6, line 5 - page 9, line 28 * | International search | [Y]US2005104015 (WEDOWSKI MARCO [DE], et al); | [X]US2008001101 (WILHELMUS VAN HERPEN MAARTEN M [NL], et al); | [A]US2010288302 (EHM DIRK HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US2011058147 (EHM DIRK HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US2011188011 (EHM DIRK HEINRICH [DE], et al) | Examination | US2004165160 | US2007125964 | US2010288302 |