EP2968334 - 3-(SUBSTITUTED-4-OXO-QUINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL)-3-DEUTERO-PIPERIDINE-2,6-DIONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deuterx, LLC 300 Brickstone Square, Suite 201 Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEWITT, Sheila 346 Bunker Hill Rd. Auburn, NH 03032 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14769837.7 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US27918 | Priority number, date | US201361786111P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361786111 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152833 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968334 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, C07D401/04 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
Y02A50/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | 3-(SUBSTITIERTES-4-OXO-CHINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL)-3-DEUTERO-PIPERIDIN-2,6-DION-DERIVATE | [2016/03] | English: | 3-(SUBSTITUTED-4-OXO-QUINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL)-3-DEUTERO-PIPERIDINE-2,6-DIONE DERIVATIVES | [2016/03] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 3-(OXOQUINAZOLIN-3(4H)-YL-4 SUBSTITUÉ)-3-DEUTÉRO-PIPÉRIDINE-2,6-DIONE ET DES COMPOSITIONS LES COMPRENANT ET DES PROCÉDÉS LES UTILISANT | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2009042177 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [YD] 1-21 * page 16, paragraph last - page 17, paragraph 4 * * claims 1,28 *; | [AP]WO2014039421 (CELGENE CORP [US]) [AP] 1-21* claim 1 *; | [Y] - FOSTER A B, "Deuterium isotope effects in the metabolism of drugs and xenobiotics: implications for drug design", ADVANCES IN DRUG RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19850101), vol. 14, ISSN 0065-2490, pages 1 - 40, XP009086953 [Y] 1-21 * page 4, paragraph second - page 5, paragraph last * | International search | [Y]US2009093504 (MULLER GEORGE W [US], et al); | [A]WO2012027065 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2012252844 (DEWITT SHEILA [US]); | [A]US8288537 (GOLEC JULIAN M C [GB], et al); | [A]US2012322799 (DAMODARA GOPAL [US]) |