EP2972721 - CROSS-REALITY SELECT, DRAG, AND DROP FOR AUGMENTED REALITY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elwha LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEIN, Gene 1198 Ridgecrest Pl Westlake, California 91362 / US | 02 /
LEVIEN, Royce A. 145 Larch Rd Apt 1 Cambridge MA 02138-3316 / US | 03 /
LORD, Richard T. 13005 Foxglove Drive NW Gig Harbor, Washington 98332 / US | 04 /
LORD, Robert W. 1410 41st Ave. E Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 05 /
MALAMUD, Mark A. 1508 Ninth Ave. W Seattle, Washington 98119 / US | 06 /
RINALDO, John D., Jr. 1560 134th Ave. SE 301 Bellevue, Washington 98005-8030 / US | 07 /
TEGREENE, Clarence T. 5910 E Mercer Way Mercer Island, Washington 98040 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14770115.5 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25579 | Priority number, date | US201313840712 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313840712 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014151366 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2972721 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/01, G06F3/0486 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G06F3/048, G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | REALITÄTSÜBERGREIFENDE AUSWAHL UND DRAG&DROP FÜR AUGMENTED-REALITY-SYSTEME | [2016/03] | English: | CROSS-REALITY SELECT, DRAG, AND DROP FOR AUGMENTED REALITY SYSTEMS | [2016/03] | French: | SÉLECTION, GLISSEMENT ET DÉPOSE EN RÉALITÉ MIXTE POUR SYSTÈMES DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2019 | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/15] | 02.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 04.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2418563 (PANTECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 2-8 * [I] 5-7,12-14; | [XI]EP2442539 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0104] * * figures 3A-4C * [I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI]EP1271293 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 2A-5 * [I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI]US2001044858 (REKIMOTO JUNICHI [JP]) [X] 1,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0452] - paragraph [0455] * * figures 41-43 * [I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI] - JUN REKIMOTO ET AL, "CyberCode", DESIGNING AUGMENTED REALITY ENVIRONMENTS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20000401), doi:10.1145/354666.354667, pages 1 - 10, XP058240882 [X] 1,8,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/354666.354667 | [XI] - REKIMOTO J ET AL, "Augment-able reality: situated communication through physical and digital spaces", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPO SIUM ON PITTSBURGH, PA, USA 19-20 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981019), doi:10.1109/ISWC.1998.729531, ISBN 978-0-8186-9074-7, pages 68 - 75, XP032146668 [X] 1,8,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1998.729531 | [XI] - BUTZ A ET AL, "Enveloping users and computers in a collaborative 3D augmented reality", AUGMENTED REALITY, 1999. (IWAR '99). PROCEEDINGS. 2ND IEEE AND ACM INT ERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 20-21 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991020), doi:10.1109/IWAR.1999.803804, ISBN 978-0-7695-0359-2, pages 35 - 44, XP010358762 [X] 1,8,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWAR.1999.803804 | International search | [Y]US2011227820 (HADDICK JOHN D [US], et al); | [Y]US2012120113 (HUESO EDUARDO [US]); | [A]WO2012108721 (THINKWARE SYSTEMS CORP [KR], et al); | [A]KR20120066552 (HWANG IN WOO [KR]); | [A]US2004113885 (GENC YAKUP [US], et al) |