EP2968307 - CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Pharma LP One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Jiangchao 10 Bellflower Ct Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
TAFESSE, Laykea 8 Windward Way Robbinsville, NJ 08690 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Braun, Nils Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Braun, Nils Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14770495.1 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25644 | Priority number, date | US201361789502P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361789502 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014151393 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2968307 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/465, A61K31/435, C07D213/81, A61P29/00, A61P25/00, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, C07D213/30, C07D403/14, C07D403/06, C07D403/12, C07D213/79, A61K31/505 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D213/79 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D239/28 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61K31/465, A61K31/435, C07D211/90, A61P29/00, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 08.10.2015 | ME | 08.10.2015 | Title | German: | CARBOXAMISDERIVATE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/03] | English: | CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF | [2016/03] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE CARBOXAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 19.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2020 | 07.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 02.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP20155483.9 / EP3666274 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 06.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012035421 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12-15 * page 157 - page 169; compounds 3-5, 17, 23, 27 * * page 255 - page 256; compounds 132, 139 * * claims 1, 77, 95 *; | [X]WO2012007836 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12-15 * page 118 - page 119; compound 78 * * page 1, paragraph [0001] * * claims 1, 45, 60 *; | [X]WO2013030665 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12-15 * page 158 - page 175; compounds 13, 37, 62, 63, 99 * * page 182 - page 186; example 39 * * claims 1, 61, 73 *; | [XP]WO2013072758 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,9,10,12-15 * pages 98-99; compound 19 * * page 99 - page 100; example 9 * * claims 1, 35, 38 *; | [E]EP2964639 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US]) [E] 1,2,4,8-10,12-15 * page 164 - page 208; compounds 13, 37, 62, 63, 99, 133, 144, 147, 149, 157 * * compounds 177, 220, 227 * * claims 1, 37, 40 * | International search | [X]WO2012035421 (PURDUE PHARMA LP [US], et al); | [X]US2005043305 (HOGENKAMP DERK J [US], et al); | [A]US2007275950 (MIYATA JUNJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2010048626 (SHAO BIN [US], et al); | [A]WO2004111011 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) |