EP2973722 - SUPERLATTICE CRENELATED GATE FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 2980 Fairview Park Drive Falls Church, VA 22042-4511 / US | [2018/44] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 2980 Fairview Park Drive Falls Church, VA 22042-4511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWELL, Robert, S. 10212 Sutherland Road Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | 02 /
STEWART, Eric, J. 1211 Highland Drive Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US | 03 /
NECHAY, Bettina, A. 1213 Bay Highlands Drive Annapolis, MD 21403 / US | 04 /
PARKE, Justin, A. 4738 Columbia Hill Court Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | 05 /
CRAMER, Harlan, C. 8610 Meadowsweet Court Columbia, MD 21045 / US | 06 /
HARTMAN, Jeffrey, D. 1607 Woodruff Court Severn, MD 21144 / US | [2018/44] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
HOWELL, Robert, S. 10212 Sutherland Road Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | ||
02 /
STEWART, Eric, J. 1105 Dryden Street Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | |||
03 /
NECHAY, Bettina, A. 1213 Bay Highlands Drive Annapolis, MD 21403 / US | |||
04 /
PARKE, Justin, A. 4738 Columbia Hill Court Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US | |||
05 /
CRAMER, Harlan, C. 8610 Meadowsweet Court Columbia, MD 21045 / US | |||
06 /
HARTMAN, Jeffrey, D. 1607 Woodruff Court Severn, MD 21144 / US | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2018/44] |
Former [2016/03] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Mendelsohn, Drucker & Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 14770672.5 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US27397 | Priority number, date | US201313802747 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313802747 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152490 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973722 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2973722 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L21/336, H01L29/10, H01L29/08, // H01L29/20 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
H01L29/7784 (EP,US);
H01L29/0843 (EP,US);
H01L29/0847 (EP,US);
H01L29/1029 (EP,US);
H01L29/1037 (EP,US);
H01L29/155 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H01L29/778, H01L29/78, H01L21/336 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FELDEFFEKT-TRANSISTOR MIT ÜBERGITTER UND GERIPPTEM GATE | [2018/31] | English: | SUPERLATTICE CRENELATED GATE FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR | [2016/03] | French: | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP À SUPER-RÉSEAU À GRILLE CRÉNELÉE | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/03] | GATE-FELDEFFEKT-TRANSISTOR MIT GERIPPTEM SUPERGITTER | ||
Former [2016/03] | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP À GRILLE CRÉNELÉE DE SUPER-RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | IE | 14.03.2019 | MT | 14.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
MT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002185655 (FAHIMULLA AYUB M [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 4 and associated text *; | [A]US2009194790 (SATO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 3,4,8* figure 6 and associated text *; | [I]KR20120010512 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-8 * figures 5, 6 and associated text *; | [A] - SHENG-HOU LIU ET AL, "Enhancement-Mode AlGaN/GaN High Electron Mobility Transistors Using a Nano-Channel Array Structure", CHINESE PHYSICS LETTERS, (201107), vol. 28, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0256-307X/28/7/077202, ISSN 0256-307X, page 077202, XP055171836 [A] 1-8 * figure 1 and associated text * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0256-307X/28/7/077202 | International search | [A]US2005189584 (MATSUDA HAJIME [JP]); | [A]US2007114567 (MATOCHA KEVIN S [US], et al); | [A]US2009045438 (INOUE TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]KR20120010512 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2012217506 (BRIERE MICHAEL A [US]) | by applicant | KR20120010512 | - T. PALACIOS et al., "Use of Double-Channel Heterostructures to Improve the Access Resistance and Linearity in GaN-Based HEMTs", IEEE Transactions on Electron Devices, (20060300), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 562 - 65 | - R. CHU, "AlGaN-GaN Double-Channel HEMTs", IEEE Transactions on Electron Devices, (20050400), vol. 52, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/TED.2005.844791, pages 438 - 46, XP011128325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TED.2005.844791 | - S. HEIKMAN et al., "High conductivity modulation doped AlGaN/GaN multiple channel heterostructures", J. of Applied Physics, (20031015), vol. 94, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1610244, pages 5321 - 25, XP012060421 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1610244 | - N.H. SHENG et al., "Multiple-Channel GaAs/AlGaAs High Electron Mobility Transistors", IEEE Electron Device Letters, (19850600), vol. EDL-6, no. 6, pages 307 - 10 | - P. SHIV HALASYAMATI et al., "Noncentrosymmetric Oxides", Chem. Mater., (19980000), vol. 10, pages 2753 - 2769 | - D. PARAMANIK et al., "Formation of large-area GaN nanostructures with controlled geometry and morphology using top-down fabrication scheme", Vac. Sci. Technol. B, (20120000), vol. 30, page 052202 |