EP2973716 - CARBON DOPING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transphorm Inc. 115 Castillian Drive Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Stacia 1335 San Antonio Creek Road Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | 02 /
SWENSON, Brian L. 5321 Berkeley Rd. Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | 03 /
FICHTENBAUM, Nicholas 47 Greenmeadow Drive Newbury Park, California 91320 / US | [2016/30] |
Former [2016/07] | 01 /
KELLER, Stacia 1335 San Antonio Creek Road Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | ||
02 /
SWENSON, Brian L. 5321 Berkeley Rd Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | |||
03 /
FICHTENBAUM, Nicholas 47 Greenmeadow Drive Newbury Park, California 91320 / US | |||
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
KELLER, Stacia 1335 San Antonio Creek Road Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | ||
02 /
SWENSON, Brian L. 775 Juniper Walk E Goleta, California 93117 / US | |||
03 /
FICHTENBAUM, Nicholas 47 Greenmeadow Drive Newbury Park, California 91320 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Soeltlstraße 2a 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14770712.9 | 14.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US27523 | Priority number, date | US201361791395P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791395 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014152605 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973716 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/16, H01L21/18, H01L29/778, H01L21/205, H01L21/02, H01L29/32, H01L29/66, H01L29/872, H01L29/10, H01L29/20, H01L29/205, H01L29/207 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H01L29/7786 (EP,US);
H01L29/7784 (US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,US);
H01L21/02584 (US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L29/1029 (US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
H01L29/205 (US);
H01L29/207 (EP,US);
H01L29/32 (US);
H01L29/66462 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H01L29/16, H01L21/18, H01L29/778, H01L21/205 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFDOTIERENDE HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTE | [2016/03] | English: | CARBON DOPING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIFS À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS À DOPAGE DE CARBONE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 17.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010244101 (KOKAWA TAKUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-13,15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1, 6 * [A] 14; | [X]US2011062556 (KOMIYAMA JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0121] * * figures 1-3, 5, 7 *; | [X]US2012299060 (KOHDA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-3 *; | [XA] - WEBB J B ET AL, "Semi-insulating C-doped GaN and high-mobility AlGaN/GaN heterostructures grown by ammonia molecular beam epitaxy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (19990816), vol. 75, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.124252, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 953 - 955, XP012024598 [X] 1-6,8 * the whole document * [A] 9-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124252 | International search | [X]JP2000068498 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2001135813 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]US2004155250 (OHBA YASUO [JP]); | [Y]JP2010171416 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]US2013020581 (TERAGUCHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) |