EP3046917 - QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS DNA METHYLTRANSFERASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Médicament 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2017/45] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Médicament 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALBY, Ludovic 6 Rue des Menuisiers F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
ARIMONDO, Paola Barbara 7 Rue Temponières F-31000 Toulouse / FR | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14771312.7 | 19.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014EP70011 | Priority number, date | EP20130306281 | 19.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13306281 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015040169 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046917 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3046917 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D401/12, A61K31/517, A61P35/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINAZOLINDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS DNA METHYLTRANSFERASE INHIBITOREN | [2017/23] | English: | QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS DNA METHYLTRANSFERASE INHIBITORS | [2016/30] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINAZOLINE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS D'ADN MÉTHYLTRANSFÉRASE | [2017/23] |
Former [2016/30] | CHINAZOLINDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS DNA-METHYLTRANSFERASEINHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2016/30] | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINAZOLINE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE L'ADN MÉTHYLTRANSFÉRASE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 02.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2014 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.09.2014 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.09.2014 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 08.11.2017 | |
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006078752 (METHYLGENE INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009049132 (SUPERGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * |