EP3074632 - ELECTRIC MOTOR DRIVEN FLUID PUMP, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FORCED LUBRICATION OF A MANUAL TRANSMISSION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FTE automotive GmbH Andreas-Humann-Strasse 2 96106 Ebern / DE | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REUL, Alexander Distelbergstrasse 6 96158 Frensdorf / DE | 02 /
STÖSSEL, Roland Am Ried 7 97514 Oberaurach / DE | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Mark Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 D-63075 Offenbach / DE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 14772072.6 | 23.09.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014EP02576 | Priority number, date | DE20131017976 | 29.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013017976 | [2016/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015078541 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074632 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3074632 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/08, F04D29/62, F04D13/06, F04D29/60, F16H57/04 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
F04D13/0606 (EP,KR,US);
F04D29/026 (US);
F04D29/086 (EP,KR,US);
F04D29/22 (US);
F04D29/426 (EP,US);
F04D29/605 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | F04D13/06, F04D29/08, F04D29/60, F16H57/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORISCH ANGETRIEBENE FLÜSSIGKEITSPUMPE, INSBESONDERE ZUR ZWANGSSCHMIERUNG EINES SCHALTGETRIEBES FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2016/40] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR DRIVEN FLUID PUMP, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FORCED LUBRICATION OF A MANUAL TRANSMISSION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2016/40] | French: | POMPE À LIQUIDES ENTRAÎNÉE PAR UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LA LUBRIFICATION FORCÉE DE LA BOÎTE DE VITESSES DE VÉHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 27.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2014 | AL | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | MT | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | CZ | 23.09.2018 | GB | 23.09.2018 | IE | 23.09.2018 | LU | 23.09.2018 | PL | 23.09.2018 | SK | 23.09.2018 | SE | 24.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.09.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
GB | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
PL | 23.09.2018 | ||
SK | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.09.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
GB | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
PL | 23.09.2018 | ||
SK | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
GB | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
PL | 23.09.2018 | ||
SK | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
GB | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
PL | 23.09.2018 | ||
SK | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
GB | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
SK | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
SK | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
SE | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0864760 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2610497 (GRUNDFOS HOLDING AS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * * figures 1,4 ** claim 1 * |