EP3194829 - TUBE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kongsberg Automotive As Dymyrgata 48 3601 Kongsberg / NO | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAFTESETH, Tommy Kallerudvegen 2 N-2815 Gjövik / NO | 02 /
LIAKLEV, Geir Lundsgate 28 N-2815 Gjövik / NO | 03 /
RUD, Henning Langbakken 38 N-2611 Lillehammer / NO | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 14772312.6 | 19.09.2014 | [2017/30] | WO2014EP69974 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041603 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194829 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3194829 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/092 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
F16L37/0915 (EP,US);
F16L33/18 (US);
F16L37/0925 (EP,US);
F16L37/0926 (EP,US);
F16L37/0927 (EP,US);
F16L2201/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHVERBINDER | [2017/30] | English: | TUBE CONNECTOR | [2017/30] | French: | RACCORD À TUBE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2020
31.07.2020
ADMISSIBLE Voss Automotive GmbH Leiersmühle 2-6 51688 Wipperfürth / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | 02
29.07.2020
31.07.2020
ADMISSIBLE CAMOZZI AUTOMATION S.p.A. Via Eritrea 20/I 25126 Brescia / IT Opponent's representative Gualeni, Nadia Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2020
31.07.2020
ADMISSIBLE Voss Automotive GmbH Leiersmühle 2-6 51688 Wipperfürth / DE Opponent's representative Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
29.07.2020
31.07.2020
ADMISSIBLE CAMOZZI AUTOMATION S.p.A. Via Eritrea 20/I 25126 Brescia / IT Opponent's representative Gualeni, Nadia Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | |||
Former [2020/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2020
Voss Automotive GmbH Leiersmühle 2-6 51688 Wipperfürth / DE Opponent's representative Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | 12.08.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 28.04.2023 | Appeal received No. T0799/23 | 28.04.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.07.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2014 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | IE | 19.09.2020 | LU | 19.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 19.09.2014 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 19.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 19.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1024537 (NEUE ARGUS GMBH) [A] 1* page 2, lines 34-44; figures 4,6 *; | [Y]GB1494553 (LEGRIS FRANCE SA) [Y] 1-6,11,14,15 * figures 1,1a * * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 4 *; | [Y]DE4002057 (VOSS ARMATUREN [DE]) [Y] 12 * figure 1 *; | [XAY]EP0579194 (VOSS ARMATUREN [DE]) [X] 1-4,11,14,15 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 23 * * figure 1 * [A] 7-10 [Y] 12,13; | [Y]US5553895 (KARL TERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,11,14,15 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 25 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2013200607 (RODENBERG ANDREW W [US], et al) [Y] 13 * figure 2B * | Opposition | EP0247214 | DE4002057 | EP0558350 | EP0579194 | US5551735 | US5553895 | US5570910 | WO2007013813 | WO2010082222 | US4123090 | GB2073350 | US4305606 | WO8505164 | GB2165604 | DE8660033U | EP0555981 | JPH11351480 | EP1143185 | WO2007025966 | WO2007118855 | WO2014000911 | DE102010008926 |