EP3049748 - ASSEMBLY DEVICE FOR A DEVICE FOR TREATING A USEFUL FLUID, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH AN ASSEMBLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewitech GmbH & Co. KG Am Langenhorster Bahnhof 16 48607 Ochtrup / DE | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIRKSKÖTTER, Frank Oster 143 48607 Ochtrup / DE | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 14772373.8 | 25.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014EP70501 | Priority number, date | DE20132008585U | 27.09.2013 Original published format: DE 202013008585 U | [2016/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015044274 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049748 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F28F25/08, F24F5/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
F28F25/087 (EP);
F24F6/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | EINBAUEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES NUTZFLUIDS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DERARTIGEN EINBAUEINRICHTUNG | [2016/31] | English: | ASSEMBLY DEVICE FOR A DEVICE FOR TREATING A USEFUL FLUID, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH AN ASSEMBLY DEVICE | [2016/31] | French: | MOYEN DE MONTAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UN FLUIDE DE SERVICE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL MOYEN DE MONTAGE | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 14.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2009153278 (HEWITECH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-10 * figure 6 *; | [X]US6513795 (SUNDER SWAMINATHAN [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 3 *; | [X]US5997173 (INGRAM LONNIE L [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE202006018754U | WO2009153278 | DE102007031160 |