EP2978373 - SYSTEM FOR USE IN TREATMENT OF VERTEBRAL FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dfine, Inc. 3047 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2021/28] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Dfine, Inc. 3047 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMAIN, Aaron 3563 S. Bascom Avenue Apt. 2 Campbell, California 95008 / US | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Bradley, Adrian Cleveland LLP 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2021/28] |
Former [2016/05] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14772615.2 | 27.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014US32051 | Priority number, date | US201313853397 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: US201313853397 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014160881 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2978373 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2978373 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/053, A61B17/00, A61B17/16, A61B17/56, A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B17/88, A61B18/18 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/16 (US);
A61B17/1631 (US);
A61B17/1642 (EP,US);
A61B17/1659 (US);
A61B17/3421 (US);
A61B17/3472 (US);
A61B17/8805 (US);
A61B17/8811 (EP,US);
A61B17/8819 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61B17/1617 (EP,US);
A61B17/1644 (EP,US);
A61B17/8816 (EP,US);
A61B18/148 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00261 (EP,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00309 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00339 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00565 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00589 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00821 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1435 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1475 (US);
A61B2018/1497 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | A61B5/053, A61B17/00, A61B17/16, A61B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON WIRBELFRAKTUREN | [2016/05] | English: | SYSTEM FOR USE IN TREATMENT OF VERTEBRAL FRACTURES | [2016/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE FRACTURES VERTÉBRALES | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 08.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2020 | 09.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2014 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | TR | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | GB | 27.03.2022 | IE | 27.03.2022 | LU | 27.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 27.03.2022 | ||
IE | 27.03.2022 | ||
LU | 27.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005216018 (SENNETT ANDREW R [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,14* figures 1,5-8 *; | [X]US2010211076 (GERMAIN AARON [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-6b *; | [X]WO2011137357 (DFINE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-6b * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * | International search | [X]US2010211076 (GERMAIN AARON [US], et al); | [A]US2011034884 (PELLEGRINO RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]WO2011137377 (DFINE INC [US], et al); | [A]US2012330180 (PELLEGRINO RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2012330301 (PELLEGRINO RICHARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005216018 | US2010211076 | WO2011137357 |