EP2967523 - TISSUE AND VASCULAR CLOSURE DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JC Medical, Inc. 1580 Gilbreth Rd Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2020/43] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Suzhou Jiecheng Medical Technology Co., Ltd. Building 4-1 2358 ChangAn Street WuJiang Jiangsu 215200 / CN | ||
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Cardiovantage Medical, Inc. 951 Mariners Island Blvd. Suite 300 San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ji 9160 Mona Avenue Burnaby, BC V3N 5A7 / CA | 02 /
WALSH, Brandon, G. 1392 W. 2176 S Syracuse, UT 84075 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14773216.8 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25003 | Priority number, date | US201361785970P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361785970 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014159754 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2967523 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/03, A61M5/00, A61B17/04, A61B17/06, // A61B17/064, A61B17/30, A61B17/34 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/06066 (US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00579 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00597 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0065 (US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00659 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00668 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00884 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00951 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00986 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/047 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0472 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06076 (US);
A61B2017/061 (US);
A61B2017/0649 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61B17/00, A61B17/03, A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | GEWEBE- UND GEFÄSSVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/03] | English: | TISSUE AND VASCULAR CLOSURE DEVICES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'OBTURATIONS TISSULAIRE ET VASCULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 29.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2023 | 06.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/10] | 27.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004105621 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 7, 11 *; | [Y]WO2007059243 (AOI MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2008249562 (CAHILL RYAN [US]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010085449 (COOK INC [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] *; | [XY]US2012010634 (CRABB RACHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 5 * figures 9-14, 26A, 26B * * paragraphs [0066] , [0 70] - [0072] - [0 83] , [ 104] , [ 109] * [Y] 1-4; | [A]US2012296372 (ZIOBRO JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2011106148 (GINN RICHARD S [US], et al); | [Y]WO2010085449 (COOK INC [US], et al); | [Y]US7351250 (ZAMIEROWSKI DAVID S [US]) |