EP2969187 - CATALYSTS FOR 2-CHLORO-1,1,1,2-TETRAFLUOROPROPANE DEHYDROCHLORINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Haiyou 811 Campbell Blvd. Amherst, New York 14228 / US | 02 /
TUNG, Hsueh Sung 16 Vassar Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Stepney, Gregory John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14773341.4 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25243 | Priority number, date | US201361783835P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361783835 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159818 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969187 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/10, B01J23/44, C07C17/087, C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C19/08 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
B01J21/10 (EP,US);
B01J23/40 (KR);
B01J23/58 (US);
B01J23/70 (KR);
B01J23/96 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J38/02 (EP,US);
B01J38/10 (EP,US);
B01J38/12 (EP,US);
B01J38/18 (EP,US);
C07C17/087 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C17/23 (KR);
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
C07C21/18 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/10 (US,EP);
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (US,EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | B01J23/10, C07C19/08, C07C17/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOREN ZUR DEHYDROCHLORIERUNG VON 2-CHLOR-1,1,1,2-TETRAFLUORPROPAN | [2016/03] | English: | CATALYSTS FOR 2-CHLORO-1,1,1,2-TETRAFLUOROPROPANE DEHYDROCHLORINATION | [2016/03] | French: | CATALYSEURS POUR LA DÉSHYDROCHLORATION DU 2-CHLORO-1,1,1,2-TÉTRAFLUOROPROPANE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5068473 (KELLNER CARL S [US], et al); | [Y]US2009240090 (MERKEL DANIEL C [US], et al); | [A]US2009299107 (WANG HAIYOU [US], et al); | [A]US2011060172 (WANG HAIYOU [US], et al); | [A]WO2012057367 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) |