EP2980698 - STARTING AN APPLICATION ON A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Unionpay Co., Ltd Cup Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAI, Hongfeng 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 02 /
LU, Zhijun 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 03 /
HE, Shuo 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Yu 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 05 /
GUO, Wei 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 06 /
LI, Dingzhou 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14773762.1 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014CN73553 | Priority number, date | CN201310104095 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: CN201310104095 | [2016/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014154098 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980698 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2980698 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F21/51, H04W12/06 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
G06F21/51 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
G06F2221/034 (US);
H04W12/45 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STARTEN EINER ANWENDUNG AUF EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/05] | English: | STARTING AN APPLICATION ON A MOBILE DEVICE | [2016/05] | French: | DÉMARRAGE D'UNE APPLICATION SUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2015 | Translation filed | 24.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 19.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2014 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004205164 (JACOBS PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-14* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US2005041686 (ROY SHAIBAL [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1802148 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1, 2; claims 1-2 * | International search | [X]CN1867913 (TEAMON SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]US2010077468 (PRAGIDES RON [US], et al) |