EP2971292 - ELECTROSPINNING APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifenet Health 1864 Concert Drive Virginia Beach, VA 23453 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCIS, Michael 1864 Concert Drive Virginia Beach, VA 23453 / US | 02 /
PRITCHARD, Andy 1864 Concert Drive Virginia Beach, VA 23453 / US | 03 /
KEMPER, Nathan 1864 Concert Drive Virginia Beach, VA 23453 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | SJW Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14773803.3 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25601 | Priority number, date | US201361786196P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361786196 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014160002 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971292 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
D01D5/0084 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (US);
D01D5/0061 (US);
D01D5/0076 (EP,US);
D01D5/0092 (EP,US);
D01F1/10 (US);
D10B2331/041 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSPINNING-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/03] | English: | ELECTROSPINNING APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2016/03] | French: | APPAREIL DE FILAGE ÉLECTROSTATIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS DE SON UTILISATION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2427382 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB]); | [XA]WO2007090102 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [XAI]CN101363137 (UNIV CHONGQING [CN]); | [A]EP2045375 (STEM CELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY [IR]); | [XAI]WO2011095141 (CPN SPOL SRO [CZ], et al); | [A]WO2012078472 (NANONERVE INC [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2013000442 (CONTIPRO BIOTECH SRO [CZ], et al) | International search | [Y]EP2045375 (STEM CELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY [IR]); | [Y]WO2011159889 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [Y]US2010183699 (WAN WANKEI [CA], et al) |