EP2974554 - SYSTEM FOR GENERATING NON-HOMOGENOUS BIOLOGICALLY-ADJUSTED LIGHT AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biological Illumination, LLC 1227 South Patrick Drive Building 2A Satellite Beach, Florida 32937 / US | For all designated states Maxik, Fredric S. 462 Sanderling Drive Indialantic, Florida 32903 / US | For all designated states Bartine, David E. 306 93 Delannoy Avenue Cocoa, Florida 32922 / US | For all designated states Soler, Robert R. 833 S. Brevard Avenue Cocoa Beach, Florida 32931 / US | For all designated states Bastien, Valerie A. 2700 Michigan Street Melbourne, Florida 32904 / US | For all designated states Schellack, James Lynn 212 Bossieux Boulevard West Melbourne, Florida 32904 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAXIK, Fredric S. 52 Country Club Road Cocoa Beach, FL 32931 / US | 02 /
BARTINE, David E. 93 Delannoy Avenue 306 Cocoa, FL 32922 / US | 03 /
SOLER, Robert R. 833 S. Brevard Avenue Cocoa Beach, FL 32931 / US | 04 /
BASTIEN, Valerie A. 2700 Michigan Street Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | 05 /
SCHELLACK, James Lynn 3434W, 163rd Street N Skiatook, OK 74070 / US | [2016/34] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
MAXIK, Fredric S. 52 Country Club Road Cocoa Beach, Florida 32931 / US | ||
02 /
BARTINE, David E. 93 Delannoy Avenue 306 Cocoa, Florida 32922 / US | |||
03 /
SOLER, Robert R. 833 S. Brevard Avenue Cocoa Beach, Florida 32931 / US | |||
04 /
BASTIEN, Valerie A. 2700 Michigan Street Melbourne Florida 32904 / US | |||
05 /
SCHELLACK, James Lynn 3434W, 163rd Street N Skiatook, OK 74070 / US | |||
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
MAXIK, Fredric S. 462 Sanderling Drive Indialantic, Florida 32903 / US | ||
02 /
BARTINE, David E. 93 Delannoy Avenue 306 Cocoa, Florida 32922 / US | |||
03 /
SOLER, Robert R. 833 S. Brevard Avenue Cocoa Beach, Florida 32931 / US | |||
04 /
BASTIEN, Valerie A. 2700 Michigan Street Melbourne Florida 32904 / US | |||
05 /
SCHELLACK, James Lynn 212 Bossieux Boulevard West Melbourne, Florida 32904 / US | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 14774608.5 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US26141 | Priority number, date | US201313803825 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313803825 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014160244 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974554 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B47/125 (EP,US);
H05B47/175 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON NICHTHOMOGENEM BIOLOGISCH GEREGELTEM LICHT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2016/03] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GENERATING NON-HOMOGENOUS BIOLOGICALLY-ADJUSTED LIGHT AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR GÉNÉRER UNE LUMIÈRE RÉGLÉE BIOLOGIQUEMENT NON HOMOGÈNE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2017 | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008146219 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [00013] , [ 00014] , [0031] , [0043] - paragraphs [0028] - [0047] - [0069] , [0070]; figures 1,3,7 *; | [Y]US2007108846 (ASHDOWN IAN [CA]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2010122446 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, lines 8-27; figures 1A-1C, *; | [Y]US2010188022 (GERLACH ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0056]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2012019138 (MAXIK FREDRIC S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2012112640 (MAXIK FREDRIC S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008032238 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 6 * | International search | [X]US2010174345 (ASHDOWN IAN EDWARD [CA]); | [Y]US2007108846 (ASHDOWN IAN [CA]); | [A]US2012019138 (MAXIK FREDRIC S [US], et al); | [A]JP2012524369 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV); | [A]US2010188022 (GERLACH ROBERT [US], et al) |