EP2980204 - MICROORGANISM DETECTION SENSOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND POLYMER LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Life Science Corporation 7-1-16 Minatojima-minamimachi, Chuo-ku Kobe City, Hyogo 650-0047 / JP | For all designated states Osaka Prefecture University Public Corporation 1-1, Gakuencho Naka-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 599-8531 / JP | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states Osaka Prefecture University Public Corporation 1-1, Gakuencho Naka-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 599-8531 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEMIZU, Mugihei c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
TOKONAMI, Shiho c/o OSAKA PREFECTURE UNIVERSITY PUBLIC CORPORATION 1-1 Gakuen-cho Naka-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 599-8531 / JP | 03 /
SHIIGI, Hiroshi c/o OSAKA PREFECTURE UNIVERSITY PUBLIC CORPORATION 1-1 Gakuen-cho Naka-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 599-8531 / JP | 04 /
NAGAOKA, Tsutomu c/o OSAKA PREFECTURE UNIVERSITY PUBLIC CORPORATION 1-1 Gakuen-cho Naka-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 599-8531 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14774943.6 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP56143 | Priority number, date | JP20130069739 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013069739 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014156584 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980204 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, C12Q1/04 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US);
C25D5/34 (US);
C25D5/48 (US);
G01N33/569 (US);
G01N2600/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | SENSOR ZUR DETEKTION VON MIKROORGANISMEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND POLYMERSCHICHT | [2016/05] | English: | MICROORGANISM DETECTION SENSOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND POLYMER LAYER | [2016/05] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DÉTECTION DE MICRO-ORGANISME, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET COUCHE POLYMÈRE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2015 | Translation filed | 24.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1862534 (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2012121229 (UNIV OSAKA PREFECT PUBLIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * whole document esp. claims * [Y] 1-9; | [Y] - SHIHO TOKONAMI ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF BACTERIAL SENSORS FABRICATED BY MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMER TECHNIQUES", CHEMICAL SENSORS, JP, (20120101), vol. 28, no. Suppl.A, pages 70 - 72, XP008180959 [Y] 1-9 * whole document esp. abstract * | International search | [X]WO2012121229 (UNIV OSAKA PREFECT PUBLIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y] - SHIHO TOKONAMI ET AL., "DEVELOPMENT OF BACTERIAL SENSORS FABRICATED BY MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMER TECHNIQUES", ABSTRACTS OF THE 79TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (2012), page 19, XP008183983 | by applicant | JP2009058232 |