EP2982098 - INTERNET PROTOCOL ADDRESS RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou H3C Technologies Co., Ltd. 466 Changhe Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Xin Room 730, Oriental Electronic Bldg. No.2 Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Congyang Room 730, Oriental Electronic Bldg. No.2 Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14778340.1 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014CN72592 | Priority number, date | CN201310113891 | 02.04.2013 Original published format: CN201310113891 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161408 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982098 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, H04L12/46, H04L12/741 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H04L61/103 (EP,US);
H04L61/2503 (US);
H04L12/4604 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L45/745 (US);
H04L45/7452 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | INTERNETPROTOKOLL-ADRESSENAUFLÖSUNG | [2016/06] | English: | INTERNET PROTOCOL ADDRESS RESOLUTION | [2016/06] | French: | RÉSOLUTION D'ADRESSE DE PROTOCOLE INTERNET | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 07.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2010095020 (RIXNER SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 6-8,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0130] * [A] 1-5,9-12; | [IY]CN102355417 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-5,9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,13-15; | [IPY]WO2013049989 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD [CN]) [IP] 1-5,9-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0032] * [Y] 6-8,13-15; | [E]WO2014036938 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figure 4 ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0071] * | International search | [A]US2009037607 (FARINACCI DINO [US], et al); | [A]CN101499951 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN102265568 (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.); | [XP]CN103179228 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) |