EP2981931 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING NOTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTIAENS, Willem V. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BILLER, Gabriel A. 4716 SW Walker Street Seattle, WA 98116 / US | 03 /
CLOVER, Kristopher W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
HACKERSON, Brian R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
HENRY, Masuma W. 401 NE 71 St., Suite 201 Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 06 /
JUNE, Stephen M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
LINZIE, Brian L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
LORENTZ, Robert D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
MAHLI, David M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
MOORE, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 11 /
MORAN, Cristin E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 12 /
O'BRIEN, Michael E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 13 /
PEARSON, Scott D. 2700 Paces Ferry Road SE Unit 802 Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | 14 /
POWELL, Dennard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 15 /
RONNING, Olen 6838 31st Ave NE Seattle, WA 98155 / US | 16 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Guruprasad 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 17 /
STANKIEWICZ, Brian J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 18 /
WOLK, Diane R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2021/09] |
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
BASTIAENS, Willem V. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
BILLER, Gabriel A. 4716 SW Walker Street Seattle, Washington 98116 / US | |||
03 /
CLOVER, Kristopher W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
HACKERSON, Brian R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
HENRY, Masuma W. 401 NE 71 St., Suite 201 Seattle, Washington 98115 / US | |||
06 /
JUNE, Stephen M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
07 /
LINZIE, Brian L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
08 /
LORENTZ, Robert D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
09 /
MAHLI, David M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
10 /
MOORE, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
11 /
MORAN, Cristin E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
12 /
O'BRIEN, Michael E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
13 /
PEARSON, Scott D. 2700 Paces Ferry Road SE Unit 802 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | |||
14 /
POWELL, Dennard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
15 /
RONNING, Olen 6838 31st Ave NE Seattle, Washington 98155 / US | |||
16 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Guruprasad 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
17 /
STANKIEWICZ, Brian J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
18 /
WOLK, Diane R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
Former [2016/06] | 01 /
BASTIAENS, Willem V. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
BILLER, Gabriel A. 225 Terry Avenue North Suite 300 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | |||
03 /
CLOVER, Kristopher W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
HACKERSON, Brian R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
HENRY, Masuma W. 225 Terry Avenue North Suite 300 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | |||
06 /
JUNE, Stephen M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
07 /
LINZIE, Brian L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
08 /
LORENTZ, Robert D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
09 /
MAHLI, David M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
10 /
MOORE, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
11 /
MORAN, Cristin E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
12 /
O'BRIEN, Michael E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
13 /
PEARSON, Scott D. 2700 Paces Ferry Road SE Unit 802 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | |||
14 /
POWELL, Dennard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
15 /
RONNING, Olen 225 Terry Avenue North Suite 300 Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | |||
16 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Guruprasad 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
17 /
STANKIEWICZ, Brian J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
18 /
WOLK, Diane R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14778504.2 | 31.03.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014US32367 | Priority number, date | US201361807510P | 02.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361807510 P | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014165438 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981931 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2981931 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/583, G06F16/35, G06K9/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G06F16/35 (EP,US);
G06F16/583 (EP,US);
H04L12/1822 (EP);
H04L12/1827 (EP);
H04L51/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | G06F17/30, G06K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/06] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON NOTEN | [2016/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING NOTES | [2016/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE NOTES | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 22.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2020 | 08.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2014 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | TR | 03.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | FR | 03.05.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GB | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
TR | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008136833 (TANIGUCHI YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0080]; figures 2-4 ** paragraph [0089] *; | [I] - LI BIAN ET AL, "PalimPost: Information Convergence Using Sticky Notes", 2ND INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON THE WEB OF THINGS, WOT 2011, IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PERVASIVE COMPUTING, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20110612), doi:10.1145/1993966.1993984, ISBN 978-1-4503-0624-9, pages 1 - 6, XP058003368 [I] 1-15 * section 3; figures 1-4 * * section 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1993966.1993984 | International search | [A]US2004017400 (LY ERIC THICHVI [US], et al); | [A]US2011285123 (WITTKE CYNTHIA SUE HASKO [US]); | [A]US2012324372 (KOWALKIEWICZ MAREK [AU], et al); | [X]US8380040 (CARTER SCOTT [US], et al) |