EP2970660 - POLYCARBONATE BLEND WITH LAW SMOKE GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro LLC 1 Covestro Circle Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiangyang 701 Reston Court Seven Fields, PA 16046 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 14778784.0 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US20520 | Priority number, date | US201361776954P | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361776954 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014164097 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970660 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08L67/00, C08L51/04, C08L67/04, C08K3/38 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C08K3/38 (EP,US);
C08L69/005 (US);
C08K5/523 (EP,US);
C08L51/085 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08K2003/387 (EP,US);
C08L2201/02 (US);
C08L2205/035 (US);
C08L2207/04 (US);
C08L2207/53 (US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08K3/38, C08K5/523, C08L51/085, C08L67/02, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | POLYCARBONATMISCHUNG MIT GERINGER RAUCHENTWICKLUNG | [2016/03] | English: | POLYCARBONATE BLEND WITH LAW SMOKE GENERATION | [2016/03] | French: | MÉLANGE DE POLYCARBONATE AVEC FAIBLE GÉNÉRATION DE FUMÉE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 04.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008090961 (LI XIANGYANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * examples 1-5; claims 1-9; table 1 *; | [Y]US2011251316 (FELDERMANN ACHIM [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9* paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0134]; claims 1-19; table 1 *; | [Y]US8217101 (LI XIANGYANG [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-15; tables 1, 2 * | International search | [A]US2011071247 (ISHII HIROMITSU [JP], et al); | [A]US2011130517 (LI XIANGYANG [US]); | [A]EP2465882 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]); | [Y]US8217101 (LI XIANGYANG [US]); | [Y]US2012289655 (SUMITA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) |