EP2982412 - HEAD POSITIONING DEVICE, MEDICAL SYSTEM, MEDICAL INSTRUMENT POSITIONING DEVICE, AND HOLDING SHELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMIYA, Rei c/o Teijin Pharma Limited Tokyo Research Center 3-2 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 02 /
OKAYAMA, Takamitsu c/o Teijin Pharma Limited Tokyo Research Center 3-2 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 03 /
TOJO, Kenji c/o Teijin Pharma Limited Tokyo Research Center 3-2 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0065 / JP | 04 /
MATSUI, Jun c/o Koankeiso Co., Ltd. 2798-36 Minamiyoshida-machi Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8042 / JP | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 14778838.4 | 28.03.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014JP59344 | Priority number, date | JP20130077158 | 02.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013077158 | [2016/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014163021 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982412 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982412 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/00, A61B90/00, A61B90/14, A61G15/12 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
A61N2/00 (EP,US);
A61G15/125 (US);
A61B90/14 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61N2/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | A61N2/00, A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPFPOSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN INSTRUMENTS UND HALTESCHALE | [2016/06] | English: | HEAD POSITIONING DEVICE, MEDICAL SYSTEM, MEDICAL INSTRUMENT POSITIONING DEVICE, AND HOLDING SHELL | [2016/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT DE TÊTE, SYSTÈME MÉDICAL, DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT D'INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL, ET COQUE DE MAINTIEN | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2014 | Translation filed | 30.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2014 | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | IE | 28.03.2018 | LU | 28.03.2018 | MT | 28.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.03.2014 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 28.03.2014 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5081665 (KOSTICH JEFFREY V [US]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US2005148808 (CAMERON ALLAN [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7,9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0035] - [0040]; figure - *; | [XI]US2007270683 (MELOY MARY JANE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] - [0009] - [0 20] - [0031]; figure - * [I] 4,6-8,10-12; | [A]US7350250 (FROELICH MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,3-5,9 * abstract * * column 3, lines 8-37; figure - * | International search | [Y]JPS595907U (HAKKO ELECTRIC MACHINE WORKS CO., LTD.); | [Y]US5081665 (KOSTICH JEFFREY V [US]); | [Y]US7024237 (BOVA FRANK J [US], et al); | [X]JP2007526027 (NEURONETICS, INC.); | [X]US2007270683 (MELOY MARY JANE [US]); | [Y]US7350250 (FROELICH MICHAEL [US]); | [X]WO2012059917 (NEURONIX LTD [IL], et al) | Examination | US3957262 | JP2009000321 | by applicant | JP2003180649 | JP2004000634 | JP2006320425 | WO2007123147 |