EP3053381 - PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK IDENTIFIER FOR NON-MOBILE NETWORK OPERATOR NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMAVAARA, Kalle ILMARI 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/32] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14780945.3 | 15.09.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014US55706 | Priority number, date | US201361884859P | 30.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361884859 P | US201414485465 | 12.09.2014 Original published format: US201414485465 | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015047774 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3053381 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3053381 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/10, // H04W48/12, H04W48/18 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/10 (KR,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (KR,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | H04W48/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KENNUNG EINES ÖFFENTLICHEN LANDFUNKNETZES FÜR NETZWERKE MIT BETREIBERN NICHTMOBILER NETZWERKE | [2016/32] | English: | PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK IDENTIFIER FOR NON-MOBILE NETWORK OPERATOR NETWORKS | [2016/32] | French: | IDENTIFIANT DE RÉSEAU MOBILE TERRESTRE PUBLIC POUR DES RÉSEAUX D'OPÉRATEUR DE RÉSEAU NON MOBILE | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 14.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2014 | AL | 17.04.2019 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | RS | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | IE | 15.09.2019 | LU | 15.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012157095 (FODOR GABOR [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,14,15,17,19-21,24,27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0017] - [0021] - [0044] - [0059] * [I] 5,6,8,11-13,16,18,22,23,25,26,28-30; | [A]US2013217381 (DHANDA MUNGAL SINGH [GB], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0051] - [0084] *; | [A] - TELECOM ITALIA ET AL, "Pseudo-CR on Option C for CSG deployments", 3GPP DRAFT; C1-082792, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080630), vol. CT WG1, no. Zagreb, Croatia; 20080630, XP050029985 [A] 1-30 * figure 1 * |