EP3038715 - A COMPOSITION COMPRISING GUACATONGA EXTRACT AND AROEIRA EXTRACT, USE THEREOF FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING SKIN AGEING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/27] | A COMPOSITION COMPRISING GUAÇATONGA EXTRACT AND AROEIRA EXTRACT, USE THEREOF AND A METHOD FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING SKIN AGING | ||
[2018/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Rodovia Régis Bittencourt s/n° km 293 Edificio I, Potuverá 06882-700 Itapecerica da Serra - Sao Paulo / BR | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARROTEIA, Kelen Fabiola c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Rua Alexandre Colares, 1188 Vila Jaguará - São Paulo CEP: 05106-000 / BR | 02 /
FERRARI, Cintia Rosa Rua Sabino 228 Cidade Ariston 3 06390-500 Carapicuíba - SP / BR | 03 /
HANNEL BUELONI, Renata Rua João Carbonari Júnior, 214 Apto. 04BI 29 CEP: 13210-705 Jundiaí - SP / BR | 04 /
CARVALHÃES LAGO, Juliana Av. Dr. Luis Tella 113 Cidade Universitária Distrito de Barão Geraldo 13083-000 Campinas - SP / BR | 05 /
PAULINELI NAVAS, Rhaisa Thaís Av. Rebouças 1278 Apto. 601 05402-000 São Paulo-SP / BR | 06 /
ARAÚJO RODRIGUES MUCHIUTTI, Pâmela Rua Luxemburgo 34 Vila Francisco Matarazzo 09241-060 Santo André - SP / BR | 07 /
DE ASSIS SANTOS, Icaro Rua do Retiro 2251 Apto. 55 Torre I 13209-255 Jundiaí - SP / BR | 08 /
IATESTA DOMENICO, Carolina Rua João Althman 290 Parque Via Norte 13065-709 Campinas - SP / BR | 09 /
ZIMBARDI, Daniela Rua Bolivia 218 Jardim Belo Horizonte 13450-182 Santa Barbara d'Oeste - SP / BR | 10 /
TEIXEIRA TAGÉ BIAGGIO, Rosa Maria Rua Lilazes 156 Jardim das Indústrias CEP: 12240-110 - São José dos Campos - SP / BR | 11 /
PASSERO, Alan Rua Paulina Ortega 355 Jd Monte Alegre 06755-240 Taboão da Serra - SP / BR | 12 /
BAIONE DE MOURA, Soraya Rua Borba Gato 331 Ed. Gran Phoenix Ap. 21 19023-300 São Paulo -SP / BR | 13 /
PEDROSO DE OLIVEIRA, Ana Paula Rua Tucuna 908 Apto. 91 05021-010 Pompéia - SP / BR | [2016/38] |
Former [2016/27] | 01 /
ARROTEIA, Kelen Fabiola Rua Gilberto Pattaro 150 Casa 65 Barão Geraldo 13084-375 Campinas - SP / BR | ||
02 /
FERRARI, Cintia Rosa Rua Sabino 228 Cidade Ariston 3 06390-500 Carapicuíba - SP / BR | |||
03 /
HANNEL BUELONI, Renata Rua João Carbonari Júnior, 214 Apto. 04BI 29 CEP: 13210-705 Jundiaí - SP / BR | |||
04 /
CARVALHÃES LAGO, Juliana Av. Dr. Luis Tella 113 Cidade Universitária Distrito de Barão Geraldo 13083-000 Campinas - SP / BR | |||
05 /
PAULINELI NAVAS, Rhaisa Thaís Av. Rebouças 1278 Apto. 601 05402-000 São Paulo-SP / BR | |||
06 /
ARAÚJO RODRIGUES MUCHIUTTI, Pâmela Rua Luxemburgo 34 Vila Francisco Matarazzo 09241-060 Santo André - SP / BR | |||
07 /
DE ASSIS SANTOS, Icaro Rua do Retiro 2251 Apto. 55 Torre I 13209-255 Jundiaí - SP / BR | |||
08 /
IATESTA DOMENICO, Carolina Rua João Althman 290 Parque Via Norte 13065-709 Campinas - SP / BR | |||
09 /
ZIMBARDI, Daniela Rua Bolivia 218 Jardim Belo Horizonte 13450-182 Santa Barbara d'Oeste - SP / BR | |||
10 /
TEIXEIRA TAGÉ BIAGGIO, Rosa Maria Rua Lilazes 156 Jardim das Indústrias CEP: 12240-110 - São José dos Campos - SP / BR | |||
11 /
PASSERO, Alan Rua Paulina Ortega 355 Jd Monte Alegre 06755-240 Taboão da Serra - SP / BR | |||
12 /
BAIONE DE MOURA, Soraya Rua Borba Gato 331 Ed. Gran Phoenix Ap. 21 19023-300 São Paulo -SP / BR | |||
13 /
PEDROSO DE OLIVEIRA, Ana Paula Rua Tucuna 908 Apto. 91 05021-010 Pompéia - SP / BR | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
Former [2016/27] | Coggins, Julia Frances, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14781043.6 | 08.09.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014BR00316 | Priority number, date | FR20130058641 | 09.09.2013 Original published format: FR 1358641 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015031971 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3038715 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3038715 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/9789, A61Q19/08 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/97 (US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | A61Q19/08, A61K8/97 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EIN EXTRAKT VON GUACATONGA UND EIN EXTRAKT VON AROEIRA, DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR PRAEVENTION UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTALTERUNG | [2018/11] | English: | A COMPOSITION COMPRISING GUACATONGA EXTRACT AND AROEIRA EXTRACT, USE THEREOF FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING SKIN AGEING | [2018/11] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE GUAÇATONGA ET UN EXTRAIT D'AROEIRA, SON UTILISATION POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET/OU LE TRAITEMENT DU VIELLISSEMENT CUTANÉ | [2018/12] |
Former [2016/27] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM GUAÇATONGA-EXTRAKT UND AROEIRA-EXTRAKT, VERWENDUNG DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRÄVENTION UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTALTERUNG | ||
Former [2016/27] | A COMPOSITION COMPRISING GUAÇATONGA EXTRACT AND AROEIRA EXTRACT, USE THEREOF AND A METHOD FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING SKIN AGING | ||
Former [2016/27] | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE GUAÇATONGA ET UN EXTRAIT D'AROEIRA, SON UTILISATION POUR PRÉVENTION ET/OU DE TRAITEMENT LE VIELLISSEMENT CUTANÉ | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Request for further processing for: | 22.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2014 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | GR | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | MT | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
GR | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
MT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
GR | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
GR | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2003095969 (KANEBO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [I]KR100848800B (BIO SPECTRUM INC [KR]) [I] 1-9 * abstract *; | [I] - "Brazilian Pepper Bar Soap", GNPD, MINTEL, (200902), Database accession no. 1046373, XP002724066 [I] 1-9 * abstract * | [Y] - "Foot Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (200611), Database accession no. 609071, XP002724067 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - ESTEVES I ET AL, "Casearia sylvestris sw. essential oil activity in inflammation in rats induced by bothrops alternatus venom", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES REVIEW AND RESEARCH, BANGALORE : GLOBAL RESEARCH ONLINE, IN, (201103), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 0976-044X, pages 28 - 32, XP002724068 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2002064538 | US2004258676 | WO2006053415 | WO2011020167 |