EP2985450 - IGNITION CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/07] | IGNITION CONTROL DEVICE | ||
[2021/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHITANI, Masahiro c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
SUGIURA, Akimitsu c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
TORIYAMA, Makoto c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
NAKAYAMA, Satoru c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
KONDOU, Yuuki c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 06 /
MORITA, Hisaharu c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 07 /
HAYASHI, Naoto c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 08 /
TAMEI, Yuuto c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 09 /
OONO, Takashi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 10 /
TAKEDA, Shunichi c/o DENSO C Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/40] |
Former [2016/07] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 14782783.6 | 11.04.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014JP60503 | Priority number, date | JP20130082960 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013082960 | JP20140043013 | 05.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014043013 | [2016/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014168239 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2985450 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2985450 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02P15/10, F02P3/04, F02P11/06 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
F02P3/0435 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F02P15/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F02P9/00 (KR);
F02P11/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | F02P15/10, F02P3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDSTEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/14] | English: | IGNITION CONTROL APPARATUS | [2021/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ALLUMAGE | [2016/07] |
Former [2016/07] | ZÜNDUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/07] | IGNITION CONTROL DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2015 | Translation filed | 22.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 27.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18161131.0 / EP3354893 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2014 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | GB | 11.04.2022 | IE | 11.04.2022 | LU | 11.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.04.2014 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
IE | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.04.2014 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
IE | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
IE | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
IE | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 11.04.2022 | ||
LU | 11.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2007224795 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5; | [XY]DE102011006268 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]EP0903493 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,3,5,7,8; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1233447 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002046745 (NAGASE NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2011174471 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2008138639 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JPH05172029 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO); | [A]JP2002195143 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2007231927 | JP2000199470 | JP2002168170 | JP2007211631 | JPH07249765 |