EP3060881 - METHOD FOR INDOOR AND OUTDOOR POSITIONING AND PORTABLE DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUKALLEL, Mehdi Cea Saclay Drt/list/diasi/lisa Batiment 861 F-91191 Gif Sur Yvette Cedex / FR | 02 /
PATAROT, Alexandre Cea Saclay Drt/list/diasi/lisa Batiment 861 F-91191 Gif Sur Yvette Cedex / FR | 03 /
LAMY-PERBAL, Sylvie Cea Saclay Drt/list/diasi/lisa Batiment 861 F-91191 Gif Sur Yvette Cedex / FR | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Laurent Jacques, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 14783636.5 | 13.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014EP71839 | Priority number, date | FR20130060384 | 24.10.2013 Original published format: FR 1360384 | [2016/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015058986 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060881 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/16, G01C25/00 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
G01C21/183 (EP,US);
G01C19/00 (US);
G01C25/005 (EP,US);
G01P15/02 (US);
G01C21/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INNEN- UND AUSSENPOSITIONIERUNG SOWIE TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2016/35] | English: | METHOD FOR INDOOR AND OUTDOOR POSITIONING AND PORTABLE DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD | [2016/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE LOCALISATION EN INTERIEUR ET EXTERIEUR ET DISPOSITIF PORTATIF METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL PROCEDE. | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 29.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1764583 (IDT COMM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CN]) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0014] - [0035] - [0036] * [I] 23; | [Y]US2012203487 (JOHNSON ERIC ALLEN [US], et al) [Y] 2-7,9-15* paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0084] - [0087] - [0094] , [0233] *; | [XYI]US2012277992 (PUN NGAN-CHEUNG [US]) [X] 1,8,24 * figures 2-3,8 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0005] - [0010] , [0028] , [0030] - [0033] - [0037] , [0040] - [0042] - [0045] - [0046] * [Y] 2-7,9-15 [I] 16-19 |