EP2988323 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITOH, Yu c/o Osaka Works of Sumimoto Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Takeyoshi c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 03 /
HIRATSUKA, Kenji c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2016/09] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
SAITOH, Yu c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | ||
02 /
MASUDA, Takeyoshi c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | |||
03 /
HIRATSUKA, Kenji c/o Osaka Works of SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 14784819.6 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014JP55566 | Priority number, date | JP20130085528 | 16.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013085528 | [2016/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014171211 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988323 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/02236 (EP,US);
H01L29/4236 (US);
H01L21/02238 (US);
H01L21/02255 (EP,US);
H01L21/049 (EP,US);
H01L21/31111 (US);
H01L21/31144 (US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,US);
H01L29/42368 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | H01L21/336, H01L21/316, H01L29/12, H01L29/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILICIUMCARBID-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS | [2016/08] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2016/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR AU CARBURE DE SILICIUM | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2015 | Translation filed | 23.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 09.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004203200 (WILLIAMS RICHARD K [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109]; figures 13E-13F * * paragraph [0116]; figures 16A-16E *; | [Y]US2007045631 (ENDO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0118]; figure 3a * * paragraph [0232] - paragraph [0233]; figure 24 *; | [Y]EP1981076 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0019]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2012098861 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 3(a)-3(e) ** figures 4(a)-4(c) *; | [Y]WO2012127821 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]US2013023113 (MASUDA TAKEYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0053]; figures 1,2,8 *; | [P]US2013306982 (KUDOU CHIAKI [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0179]; figures 9-17 * | International search | [A]JPH07273323 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]JP2002299619 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG); | [Y]JP2003509836 (WILLIAMS, RICHARD, K.); | [Y]JP2004303802 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2005019668 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG); | [Y]JP2005510087 (GENERAL SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.); | [A]JP2006344760 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2007103729 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2008519436 (INTERNATIONAL RECTIFIER CORP.); | [A]JP2009088188 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2011216651 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP); | [A]US2012037983 (HSHIEH FWU-IUAN [US]); | [Y]JP2012038771 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2012216675 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [A]US2012292693 (LEE YEEHENG [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH07326755 |