EP2986316 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE ASSOCIATED DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immuron Limited Unit 10, 25-37 Chapman Street Blackburn North, Victoria 3130 / AU | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Immuron Limited 18 Kavanagh Street Level 1 Southbank, Victoria 3006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYRAS, Dena 65 Dresden Street Heidelberg Heights, Victoria 3081 / AU | 02 /
HUTTON, Melanie 603/45 Claremont Street South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | 03 /
CUNNINGHAM, Bliss 14 Prospect Hill Crescent Dandenong North, Victoria 3175 / AU | 04 /
LI, Lucy 5 Vaucluse Court Wheelers Hill, Victoria 3150 / AU | 05 /
CARTER, Glen 12 Boathaven Road Point Cook, Victoria 3030 / AU | 06 /
ROOD, Julian 16 Wilson Street Bentleigh, Victoria 3204 / AU | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2023/04] |
Former [2016/08] | Ehnis, Tobias, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14784945.9 | 17.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014AU00447 | Priority number, date | AU20130901386 | 19.04.2013 Original published format: AU 2013901386 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014169344 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986316 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986316 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, A61K39/395, A61K39/40, A61P1/12, A61P31/04 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/1282 (EP,US);
A61K39/40 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K16/04 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
C07K2317/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | A61K39/395, A61K39/40, A61P1/12, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER PROPHYLAXE VON CLOSTRIDIUM-DIFFICILE-VERMITTELTEN KRANKHEITEN | [2016/08] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE ASSOCIATED DISEASE | [2016/08] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LA PROPHYLAXIE D'UNE MALADIE ASSOCIÉE À CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 18.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2022 | 17.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | IE | 17.04.2023 | LU | 17.04.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 17.04.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 17.04.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 17.04.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 25.01.2023 | |
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO9902188 (UNIV ARIZONA [US]) [I] 9-12 * abstract * * page 19; example 3 * * page 7, line 23 - line 25 * [Y] 6,7,9-12; | [XY]US6613329 (KINK JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,13-15 * column 134 - column 138; example 32 * [Y] 6,7,9-12; | [XY]US2004126383 (THOMAS WILLIAM D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,13-15 * page 8, paragraph 0093 * [Y] 6,7,9-12; | [XY]WO2010094970 (HEALTH PROT AGENCY [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,14,15 * abstract * * page 24; example 5 * * page 25 - page 26; example 7 * * page 28 - page 29 * * page 34; example 14 * * page 35; example 16 * * page 35; example 17 * [Y] 6,7,9-12; | [XY] - MAROZSAN ANDRE J ET AL, "Protection against Clostridium difficile infection with broadly neutralizing antitoxin monoclonal antibodies", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES UNITED STATES 15 DEC 2010, INFECTIOUS DISEASES SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (20120901), vol. 206, no. 5, doi:10.1093/INFDIS/JIS416, ISSN 1537-6613, pages 706 - 713, XP009168808 [X] 1-5,8,14,15 * abstract * * table 2 * * figure 3 * * page 2, column l, paragraph 5 - column r, paragraph 3 * * table 1 * [Y] 6,7,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/infdis/jis416 | [XY] - VAN DISSEL JAAP T ET AL, "Bovine antibody-enriched whey to aid in the prevention of a relapse of Clostridium difficile-associated diarrhoea: preclinical and preliminary clinical data", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (20050201), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1099/JMM.0.45773-0, ISSN 0022-2615, pages 197 - 205, XP009100058 [X] 1,2,5,13-15 * abstract * * page 199, column r, paragraph 4 * * page 200, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 200, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 201, column r, paragraph 3 * [Y] 6,7,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jmm.0.45773-0 | [XY] - J Salcedo ET AL, "Intravenous immunoglobulin therapy for severe Clostridium diYcile colitis", Gut, (19970101), pages 366 - 370, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC1891485/pdf/v041p00366.pdf, (20161020), XP055312557 [X] 1,2,5,13-15 * abstract * * page 367, column r, paragraph 3 - page 368, column l, paragraph 1 * [Y] 6,7,9-12 | [XY] - BABCOCK GREGORY J ET AL, "Human monoclonal antibodies directed against toxins A and B prevent Clostridium difficile-induced mortality in hamsters", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20061101), vol. 74, no. 11, doi:10.1128/IAI.00982-06, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 6339 - 6347, XP009109025 [X] 1,2,5,13-15 * abstract * * figures 4-5 * [Y] 6,7,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00982-06 | [Y] - G. L. MULVEY ET AL, "Therapeutic potential of egg yolk antibodies for treating Clostridium difficile infection", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY., GB, (20110407), vol. 60, no. 8, doi:10.1099/jmm.0.029835-0, ISSN 0022-2615, pages 1181 - 1187, XP055312598 [Y] 6,7,9-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jmm.0.029835-0 | [A] - GREG HUSSACK AND JAMSHID TANHA, "Toxin-Specific Antibodies for the Treatment of Clostridium difficile: Current Status and Future Perspectives", TOXINS, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY PRESERVATION INTERNATIONAL (MDPI) AG, CH, vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.3390/TOXINS2050998, ISSN 2072-6651, (20100507), pages 998 - 1018, (20100507), XP002692188 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/toxins2050998 | International search | [X]WO2012092469 (CANGENE CORP [CA], et al) | Examination | - C. H. Chilton ET AL, "Comparative proteomic analysis of Clostridium difficile isolates of varying virulence", Journal of Medical Microbiology, (20140120), vol. 63, no. Pt_4, doi:10.1099/jmm.0.070409-0, ISSN 0022-2615, pages 489 - 503, XP055513999 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jmm.0.070409-0 | - P. Vohra ET AL, "Comparison of toxin and spore production in clinically relevant strains of Clostridium difficile", Microbiology, GB, (20110217), vol. 157, no. 5, doi:10.1099/mic.0.046243-0, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 1343 - 1353, XP055514009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.046243-0 | - Eero Mattila ET AL, "A randomized, double-blind study comparing Clostridium difficile immune whey and metronidazole for recurrent Clostridium difficile-associated diarrhoea: Efficacy and safety data of a prematurely interrupted trial", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES., NO, (20080108), vol. 40, no. 9, doi:10.1080/00365540801964960, ISSN 0036-5548, pages 702 - 708, XP055311806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00365540801964960 | - MERRIGAN MICHELLE ET AL, "Human hypervirulent Clostridium difficile strains exhibit increased sporulation as well as robust toxin production", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 192, no. 19, doi:10.1128/JB.00445-10, ISSN 0021-9193, (20101001), pages 4904 - 4911, (20100730), XP009140830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.00445-10 | - DAVID A BURNS ET AL, "Sporulation studies in", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 87, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.MIMET.2011.07.017, ISSN 0167-7012, (20110721), pages 133 - 138, (20110816), XP028308217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2011.07.017 | by applicant | US4550019 | US4748018 | US6537500 | WO03080082 | US2004161427 | WO2004078209 | WO2006053383 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 1521 - 1712 |