EP2981532 - PROCESS FOR POMALIDOMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80 & 81 A.P.I.E., Balanagar Hyderabad 500018, Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E., Balanagar Hyderabad Andhrapradesh Hyderabad 500 018 / IN | ||
For all designated states Parthasaradhi, Reddy Bandi Plot No.B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar Andhra Pradesh Hyderabad 500018 / IN | |||
For all designated states Rathnakar Reddy, Kura Hetero Research Foundation PlotNo. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar Hyderabad Andhra Pradesh, Hyderabad 500018 / IN | |||
For all designated states Muralidhara Reddy, Dasari Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar Hyderabad, Andhra Pradesh Hyderabad 500018 / IN | |||
For all designated states Ramakrishna Reddy, Matta Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar Hyderabad 500018 / IN | |||
For all designated states Vamsi Krishna, Bandi Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar Hyderabad, Andhra Pradesh Hyderabad 500018 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARTHASARADHI REDDY, Bandi Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar, Hyderabad Hyderabad 500018 Andhra pradesh / IN | 02 /
RATHNAKAR REDDY, Kura Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar, Hyderabad Hyderabad 500018 Andhra pradesh / IN | 03 /
MURALIDHARA REDDY, Dasari Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar, Hyderabad Hyderabad 500018 Andhra pradesh / IN | 04 /
RAMAKRISHNA REDDY, Matta Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar, Hyderabad Hyderabad 500018 / IN | 05 /
VAMSI KRISHNA, Bandi Hetero Research Foundation Plot No. B-80&81 A.P.I.E. Balanagar, Hyderabad Hyderabad 500018 Andhra pradesh / IN | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 14785011.9 | 01.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014IN00205 | Priority number, date | IN2013CHE1484 | 01.04.2013 Original published format: IN 1484CH2013 | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/06] | IN2013CHE1484 | 01.04.2013 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014170909 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2981532 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D307/89, A61K31/445 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/13 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR POMALIDOMID | [2016/06] | English: | PROCESS FOR POMALIDOMIDE | [2016/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POMALIDOMIDE | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 13.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7994327 (GE CHUANSHENG [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * example 17 *; | [AP]WO2013126326 (CELGENE CORP [US]) [AP] 1-4 * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0248] * | International search | [X]US7994327 (GE CHUANSHENG [US], et al); | [X]WO2011050962 (RATIOPHARM GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2005023192 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al); | [AP]WO2013126326 (CELGENE CORP [US]) |