EP3032879 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICE FOR HELPING MULTI-MODE TERMINAL DISCOVER COMMUNICATIONS OPPORTUNITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Feng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Peguet, Wilfried, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14785321.2 | 16.05.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014CN77706 | Priority number, date | CN201310337533 | 05.08.2013 Original published format: CN201310337533 | [2016/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014169872 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032879 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/14, H04W48/18 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (CN,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W36/0066 (EP,US);
H04W36/30 (CN);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ERKENNUNGSMÖGLICHKEITEN EINER KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINEM MULTIMODUS-ENDGERÄT | [2016/24] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICE FOR HELPING MULTI-MODE TERMINAL DISCOVER COMMUNICATIONS OPPORTUNITIES | [2016/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF POUR AIDER UN TERMINAL MULTIMODE À DÉCOUVRIR DES OPPORTUNITÉS DE COMMUNICATION | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2016 | Translation filed | 04.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 28.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010093340 (BURACCHINI ENRICO [IT]) [X] 1,14,16 * paragraphs [0076] , [ 0082] - [0098] - [ 0113] , [ 0114]; figure 8B * [I] 2-13,15,17; | [XA]WO2012046925 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,14,16 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0057] - [0068] * [A] 2-13,15,17; | [A]WO2013002693 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 28 *; | [A]CN102958079 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0404]; figure 5 *; | [P]US2013208700 (LIM JAE WON [KR], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0057] - [0068] *; | EP2736284 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0099] - [0103]; figure 5 * | International search | [X]CN101406090 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]); | [A]CN102833813 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN102946586 (ZTE CORP) |