EP3057479 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K-fee System GmbH Senefelder Strasse 44 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMPL, Günter Falltorstrasse 12 51429 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | 02 /
KRÜGER, Marc Zaunkönigweg 1 51467 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | [2016/34] | Representative(s) | Loock, Jan Pieter, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Loock, Jan Pieter, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 14786199.1 | 17.10.2014 | [2016/34] | WO2014EP72376 | Priority number, date | DE201310221234 | 18.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013221234 | DE201410211371 | 13.06.2014 Original published format: DE102014211371 | [2016/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015055849 | Date: | 23.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3057479 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A47J31/36, B65D85/804 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A47J31/4492 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/3623 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/44 (MX);
A23C9/1508 (US);
A23F3/18 (EP,US);
A23F5/262 (EP,US);
A23G1/56 (US);
A47J31/369 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/407 (KR,US);
A47J31/58 (US);
A47J31/60 (US);
B65D85/8046 (EP,KR,MX,US);
B65D85/8058 (EP,MX,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
B65D2203/00 (EP,US);
B65D2203/06 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUBEREITEN EINES GETRÄNKS | [2016/34] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE | [2016/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE BOISSON | [2016/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 22.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1554958 (SCHIFFERLE RENE [CH]) [X] 1-42 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE202011001184U (LANG STEPHANIE [DE]) [X] 1-42 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036]; claims 3,6,16,19 *; | [X]EP2345351 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1-42 * figures 1-4,6 *; | [X]WO2012123440 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-42 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP2572609 (TEATEK CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-42 * figures 1,3,6,7,9-11 *; | [X]WO2013046149 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-42* figures 2-7 * |